California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1287 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1287AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Harman  (   Coauthors:   Senators   Berryhill,   Cannella,   and Correa   )   (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Cook   )  FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section  11000   7150  of the  Government   Fish and Game  Code, relating to  state government.   fish.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1287, as amended, Harman.  State government.   Sport fishing licenses.  Existing law generally requires a sport fishing license for the taking of a fish, reptile, or amphibian. Existing law requires the Department of Fish and Game to issue a license, upon payment of a fee, to eligible California residents and nonresidents, as specified. Existing law requires the department to issue a reduced fee license, as specified, to a disabled veteran, as defined.   This bill would also require the department to issue a reduced fee license to active military personnel who are recovering service members, as defined, and who demonstrate eligibility, as prescribed.   Existing law provides within state government in the executive department, state departments and state agencies, as defined. Existing law sets forth the powers and duties of state departments and state agencies.   This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to a related provision.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 7150 of the   Fish and Game Code   is amended to read:  7150. (a) Upon application to the department's headquarters office in Sacramento and payment of a base fee of four dollars ($4), as adjusted pursuant to Section 713, the following persons, who have not been convicted of any violation of this code, shall be issued a reduced fee sport fishing license that is valid for the calendar year of issue, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder thereof and that authorizes the licensee to take any fish, reptile, or amphibians anywhere in this state as otherwise authorized pursuant to this code and regulations adopted pursuant thereto for purposes other than profit: (1) A disabled veteran having a 50 percent or greater  service connected   service-connected  disability upon presentation of proof of an honorable discharge from military service and proof of the disability. Proof of the disability shall be by certification from the United States Veterans Administration or by presentation of a license issued pursuant to this paragraph in the preceding license year.  (2) A member of the military who is a "recovering service member" pursuant to Section 1602(7) of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2008 (Public Law 110-181). A person shall be eligible for a reduced fee sport fishing license pursuant to this paragraph upon the submission of a letter, online or in hardcopy, to the department from that person's commanding officer and from a military medical doctor stating that the person is a recovering service member.   (2)   (3)  A person over 65 years of age who is a resident of this state and whose total monthly income from all sources, including any old age assistance payments, does not exceed the amount in effect on September 1 of each year contained in subdivision (c) of Section 12200 of the Welfare and Institutions Code for single persons or subdivision (d) of Section 12200 of the Welfare and Institutions Code combined income for married persons, as adjusted pursuant to that section. The amount in effect on September 1 of each year shall be the amount used to determine eligibility for a reduced fee license during the following calendar year. (b) A person applying for a reduced fee sport fishing license shall submit adequate documentation for the department to determine whether the applicant is, in fact, eligible for a reduced fee sport fishing license. The documentation shall be in the form of a letter or other document, as specified by the department, from a public agency, except as provided in  paragraph   paragraphs  (1)  and (2)  of subdivision (a). The department shall not issue a reduced fee sport fishing license to any person unless it is satisfied that the applicant has provided adequate documentation of eligibility for that license. (c) The adjustment of the base fee pursuant to Section 713 specified in subdivision (a) shall be applicable to the fishing license years beginning on or after January 1, 1996.  SECTION 1.   Section 11000 of the Government Code is amended to read: 11000. (a) As used in this title, "state agency" includes every state office, officer, department, division, bureau, board, and commission. As used in any section of this title that is added or amended effective on or after January 1, 1997, "state agency" does not include the California State University, unless the section explicitly provides that the section applies to the university. (b) References to particular state agencies in this title, without further identification, such as to the "Treasurer" or "Department of General Services," are references to the state officer or agency known by that name.