California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1287 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/26/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1287AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Harman (Coauthors: Senators Berryhill, Cannella, and Correa) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Cook) FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section 7150 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1287, as amended, Harman. Sport fishing licenses.  Existing law generally requires   Under existing law,  a sport fishing license  for the taking of a fish, reptile, or amphibian   grants the privilege to take fish, reptiles, and amphibia  . Existing law requires the Department of Fish and Game to issue a  sport fishing  license, upon payment of a fee, to eligible California residents and nonresidents, as specified. Existing law requires the department to issue a reduced fee  sport fishing  license, as specified, to a disabled veteran, as defined. This bill would also require the department to issue a reduced fee  sport fis   hing  license to active military personnel who are recovering service members, as defined, and who demonstrate eligibility, as prescribed. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7150 of the Fish and Game Code is amended to read: 7150. (a) Upon application to the department's headquarters office in Sacramento and payment of a base fee of four dollars ($4), as adjusted pursuant to Section 713, the following persons, who have not been convicted of any violation of this code, shall be issued a reduced fee sport fishing license that is valid for the calendar year of issue, or, if issued after the beginning of the year, for the remainder thereof and that authorizes the licensee to take any fish, reptile, or amphibians anywhere in this state as otherwise authorized pursuant to this code and regulations adopted pursuant thereto for purposes other than profit: (1) A disabled veteran having a 50 percent or greater service-connected disability upon presentation of proof of an honorable discharge from military service and proof of the disability. Proof of the disability shall be by certification from the United States Veterans Administration or by presentation of a license issued pursuant to this paragraph in the preceding license year. (2) A member of the military who is a "recovering service member" pursuant to Section 1602(7) of the  federal  National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2008 (Public Law 110-181). A person shall be eligible for a reduced fee sport fishing license pursuant to this paragraph upon the submission of a letter, online or in hardcopy, to the department from that person's commanding officer  and   or  from a military medical doctor stating that the person is a recovering service member. (3) A person over 65 years of age who is a resident of this state and whose total monthly income from all sources, including any old age assistance payments, does not exceed the amount in effect on September 1 of each year contained in subdivision (c) of Section 12200 of the Welfare and Institutions Code for single persons or subdivision (d) of Section 12200 of the Welfare and Institutions Code combined income for married persons, as adjusted pursuant to that section. The amount in effect on September 1 of each year shall be the amount used to determine eligibility for a reduced fee license during the following calendar year. (b) A person applying for a reduced fee sport fishing license shall submit adequate documentation for the department to determine whether the applicant is, in fact, eligible for a reduced fee sport fishing license. The documentation shall be in the form of a letter or other document, as specified by the department, from a public agency, except as provided in paragraphs (1) and (2) of subdivision (a). The department shall not issue a reduced fee sport fishing license to any person unless it is satisfied that the applicant has provided adequate documentation of eligibility for that license. (c) The adjustment of the base fee pursuant to Section 713 specified in subdivision (a) shall be applicable to the fishing license years beginning on or after January 1, 1996.