BILL NUMBER: SB 1359AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Simitian FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Sections 18796 and 18864 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation , and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1359, as amended, Simitian. Personal income taxes: contributions: California Breast Cancer Research Fund: California Cancer Research Fund. Personal Income Tax Law allows taxpayers, until January 1, 2013, to designate on their tax returns that a specified amount in excess of their tax liability be contributed to the California Breast Cancer Research Fund. This bill would extend the operation of those provisions until January 1, 2018. The Personal Income Tax Law allows taxpayers to designate on their tax returns that a specified amount in excess of their tax liability be contributed to the California Cancer Research Fund. Existing law provides that these provisions are repealed on either January 1 of the 5th taxable year following the taxable year the fund first appears on the personal income tax return or on January 1 of an earlier taxable year, if the Franchise Tax Board estimates that the annual contribution amount will be less than $250,000, or an adjusted amount, as specified, for subsequent taxable years. This bill would instead provide that these provisions are repealed on either January 1, 2018, or on January of an earlier taxable year, if the Franchise Tax Board estimates that the annual contribution amount will be less than the amounts described above. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3 majority . Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18796 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 18796. (a) This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed. (b) (1) By September 1, 2006, and by September 1 of each subsequent calendar year that the California Breast Cancer Research Fund appears on a tax return, the Franchise Tax Board shall do all of the following: (A) Determine the minimum contribution amount required to be received during the next calendar year for the fund to appear on the tax return for the taxable year that includes that next calendar year. (B) Provide written notification to the University of California of the amount determined in subparagraph (A). (C) Determine whether the amount of contributions estimated to be received during the calendar year will equal or exceed the minimum contribution amount determined by the Franchise Tax Board for the calendar year pursuant to subparagraph (A). The Franchise Tax Board shall estimate the amount of the contributions to be received by using the actual amounts received and an estimate of the contributions that will be received by the end of that calendar year. (2) If the Franchise Tax Board determines that the amount of contributions estimated to be received during a calendar year will not at least equal the minimum contribution amount for the calendar year, this article is repealed with respect to taxable years beginning on or after January 1 of that calendar year. (3) For purposes of this section, the minimum contribution amount for a calendar year means two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) for the 1997 calendar year or the minimum contribution amount adjusted pursuant to subdivision (c). (c) For each calendar year, beginning with calendar year 1998, the Franchise Tax Board shall adjust, on or before September 1 of that calendar year, the minimum contribution amount specified in subdivision (b) as follows: (1) The minimum contribution amount for the calendar year shall be an amount equal to the product of the minimum contribution amount for the prior calendar year multiplied by the inflation factor adjustment as specified in paragraph (2) of subdivision (h) of Section 17041, rounded off to the nearest dollar. (2) The inflation factor adjustment used for the calendar year shall be based on the figures for the percentage change in the California Consumer Price Index that are received on or before August 1 of the calendar year pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (h) of Section 17041. (d) Notwithstanding the repeal of this article, any contribution amounts designated pursuant to this article prior to its repeal shall continue to be transferred and disbursed in accordance with this article as in effect immediately prior to that repeal. SEC. 2. Section 18864 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 18864. (a) Except as otherwise provided in subdivision (b), this article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed. (b) (1) By September 1 of the second calendar year and each subsequent calendar year that the California Cancer Research Fund appears on the tax return, the Franchise Tax Board shall do all of the following: (A) Determine the minimum contribution amount required to be received during the next calendar year for the fund to appear on the tax return for the taxable year that includes that next calendar year. (B) Provide written notification to the Regents of the University of California of the amount determined in subparagraph (A). (C) Determine whether the amount of contributions estimated to be received during the calendar year will equal or exceed the minimum contribution amount determined by the Franchise Tax Board for the calendar year pursuant to subparagraph (A). The Franchise Tax Board shall estimate the amount of contributions to be received by using the actual amounts received and an estimate of the contributions that will be received by the end of that calendar year. (2) If the Franchise Tax Board determines that the amount of the contributions estimated to be received during a calendar year will not at least equal the minimum contribution amount for the calendar year, this article is repealed with respect to taxable years beginning on or after January 1 of that calendar year. (3) For purposes of this section, the minimum contribution amount for a calendar year means two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) for the second calendar year after the first appearance of the California Cancer Research Fund on the personal income tax return or the adjusted minimum contribution amount adjusted pursuant to subdivision (c). (c) For each calendar year, beginning with the third calendar year after the first appearance of the California Cancer Research Fund on the personal income tax return, the Franchise Tax Board shall adjust, on or before September 1 of that calendar year, the minimum contribution amount specified in subdivision (b) as follows: (1) The minimum estimated contribution amount for the calendar year shall be an amount equal to the product of the minimum estimated contribution amount for the calendar year multiplied by the inflation factor adjustment as specified in subparagraph (A) of paragraph (2) of subdivision (h) of Section 17041, rounded off to the nearest dollar. (2) The inflation factor adjustment used for the calendar year shall be based on the figures for the percentage change in the California Consumer Price Index received on or before August 1 of the calendar year pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (h) of Section 17041. (d) Notwithstanding the repeal of this article, any contribution amounts designated pursuant to this article prior to its repeal shall continue to be transferred and disbursed in accordance with this article as in effect immediately prior to that repeal. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure that taxpayers are allowed to continue to contribute amounts in excess of their tax liability for the support of cancer research, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.