BILL NUMBER: SB 1540ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 20, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Perea and V. Manuel Prez) (Coauthors: Senators De Len and Wyland) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Davis, Eng, Portantino, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 60200.8 to the Education Code, relating to instructional materials. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1540, Hancock. Instructional materials: revised curriculum framework: history-social science. Existing law prohibits the State Board of Education from adopting instructional materials until the 2015-16 school year. This bill would authorize the state board to consider the adoption of a revised curriculum framework and evaluation criteria for instructional materials in history-social science. The bill would require the State Department of Education to conduct work necessary to revise the curriculum framework and evaluation criteria for instructional materials in history-social science only after it has completed work related to the development of curriculum frameworks for the common core academic content standards as provided by law. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) The K-12 History-Social Science Framework was last adopted in 2003 and the scheduled draft of an updated curriculum framework was nearly completed in 2009 when state budget actions led to the suspension of the adoption process. (b) The Common Core State Standards for English language arts include standards for literacy in history-social science, science, and technical subjects. (c) The adoption of an updated curriculum framework does not mandate the purchase of new instructional materials, but provides guidance for the purchase of updated supplemental instructional materials and does not result in automatic new costs to the state or local educational agencies. SEC. 2. Section 60200.8 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60200.8. (a) Notwithstanding Section 60200.7, the state board may consider the adoption of a revised curriculum framework and evaluation criteria for instructional materials in history-social science. (b) The department shall conduct work necessary to revise the curriculum framework and evaluation criteria for instructional materials in history-social science only after it has completed work related to the development of curriculum frameworks for the common core academic contents standards pursuant to Section 60207.