California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB206 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/12/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 206ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 14, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 11, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 15, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe FEBRUARY 8, 2011 An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 206, Kehoe. Claim against the state: appropriation. Existing law establishes the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners' Fund for use by the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners for all necessary and proper expenses carried out by the board. Existing law authorizes a procedure for the payment of claims against the state. This bill would appropriate $600,000 from the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners' Fund to the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners to pay for a specified settlement. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of six hundred thousand dollars ($600,000) is hereby appropriated from the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners' Fund to the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners to pay for the settlement in the case of Catherine Hayes v. Board of Chiropractic Examiners (Sacramento County Superior Court, Case No. 34-2008-0000647). Any funds appropriated in excess of the amounts required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners' Fund on June 30 of the fiscal year in which the final payment is made. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to pay judgment and settlement claims against the state and end hardship to claimants as quickly as possible, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.