California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB292 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/15/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 292AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Padilla FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to amend  Sections 66746 and 66747   Section 66746  of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 292, as amended, Padilla. Public postsecondary education: community colleges: transfers.  The Student Transfer Achievement Reform Act (act) requires the California State University to guarantee admission with junior status to a community college student who meets the requirements for the associate degree for transfer. A student admitted to the California State University pursuant to the act is entitled to receive priority over all other community college transfer students, excluding community college students who have entered into a transfer agreement between a community college and the California State University prior to the fall term of the 2012-13 academic year.   Existing law states the intent of the Legislature that specified categories be followed, insofar as practicable, in numeric order for the purposes of enrollment planning and admission priority practice at the undergraduate resident student level for the California State University and the University of California.   This bill would require that students admitted to the California State University pursuant to the act receive priority for purposes of enrollment planning and admissions, if the students have met the requirements of an approved transfer agreement consistent with this priority.  Existing law encourages community colleges to facilitate the acceptance of credits earned at other community colleges toward the associate degree for transfer. This bill would instead require community colleges to accept credits earned at other community colleges toward the associate degree for transfer, thereby imposing a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66746 of the Education Code is amended to read: 66746. (a) Commencing with the fall term of the 2011-12 academic year, a student who earns an associate degree for transfer granted pursuant to subdivision (b) shall be deemed eligible for transfer into a California State University baccalaureate program if the student meets both of the following requirements: (1) Completion of 60 semester units or 90 quarter units that are eligible for transfer to the California State University, including both of the following: (A) The Intersegmental General Education Transfer Curriculum (IGETC) or the California State University General Education-Breadth Requirements. (B) A minimum of 18 semester units or 27 quarter units in a major or area of emphasis, as determined by the community college district. (2) Obtainment of a minimum grade point average of 2.0. (b) (1) As a condition of receipt of state apportionment funds, a community college district shall develop and grant associate degrees for transfer that meet the requirements of subdivision (a). A community college district shall not impose any requirements in addition to the requirements of this section, including any local college or district requirements, for a student to be eligible for the associate degree for transfer and subsequent admission to the California State University pursuant to Section 66747. (2) The condition of receipt of state apportionment funding contained in paragraph (1) shall become inoperative if, by December 31, 2010, each of the state's 72 community college districts has submitted to the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, for transmission to the Director of Finance, signed certification waiving, as a local agency request within the meaning of paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution, any claim of reimbursement related to the implementation of this article. (c) A community college district is encouraged to consider the local articulation agreements and other work between the respective faculties from the affected community college and California State University campuses in implementing the requirements of this section. (d) Community colleges shall accept credits earned at other community colleges toward the associate degree for transfer pursuant to this section. (e) This section shall not preclude students who are assessed below collegiate level from acquiring remedial noncollegiate level coursework in preparation for obtaining the associate degree. Remedial noncollegiate level coursework shall not be counted as part of the transferable units required pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (a).  SEC. 2.   Section 66747 of the Education Code is amended to read: 66747. Notwithstanding Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 66201), the California State University shall guarantee admission with junior status to a community college student who meets all of the requirements of Section 66746. Admission to the California State University, as provided under this article, does not guarantee admission for specific majors or campuses. Notwithstanding Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 66201), the California State University shall grant a student priority admission to his or her local California State University campus and to a program or major that is similar to his or her community college major or area of emphasis, as determined by the California State University campus to which the student is admitted. A student admitted under this article shall receive priority for purposes of enrollment planning and admissions in accordance with Section 66202 over all other community college transfer students, excluding community college students who have entered into a transfer agreement between a community college and the California State University prior to the fall term of the 2012-13 academic year. A student admitted pursuant to this article shall have met the requirements of an approved transfer agreement consistent with subdivision (a) of Section 66202.   SEC. 3.   SEC. 2.  If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.