BILL NUMBER: SB 300INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to add Section 60605.85 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 300, as introduced, Hancock. Academic Content Standards Commission for Science and History-Social Science. Existing law, operative until July 1, 2011, and to be repealed on January 1, 2014, requires the State Board of Education to adopt statewide academic content standards and performance standards, based on the recommendation of the Commission for the Establishment of Academic Content and Performance Standards and the Superintendent of Public Instruction, respectively. Existing law authorizes the state board to modify any proposed content standard or performance standard prior to its adoption. This bill would establish the Academic Content Standards Commission for Science and History-Social Science consisting of 21 appointed members, as specified. The bill would require the commission to develop academic content standards in science and history-social science, which shall be internationally benchmarked and build toward college and career readiness by the time of high school graduation. The bill would require the commission to present its recommended academic content standards to the state board on or before January 1, 2013, and would require the state board to either adopt or reject the those standards on or before June 30, 2013. The bill would also require the Superintendent and the state board to present specified information to the Governor and appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) It is widely acknowledged that California has the eighth largest economy in the world. (b) California must develop scientifically and technologically literate citizens in order to maintain our edge in the world economy. (c) The state's current science content standards do not include any mention of biotechnologies or nanotechnologies, and they do not require pupils to learn about environmental issues or the fact that Pluto is no longer considered a planet. (d) The state's science and history-social science content standards were developed in 1998 and are now 13 years old. (e) There is nothing in current law that requires science and history-social science content standards to be reviewed and updated. (f) Ever changing historical trends, economic conditions, cultural exchanges, and demographics have created a greater need than ever before for understanding the foundational ideas and philosophy of our country and the world. (g) The goals of educating pupils in history-social science fall into the following three broad categories: (1) Knowledge and cultural understanding, which includes incorporating learning from history, the other humanities, geography, and the social sciences. (2) Demographic understanding and civic values, which includes incorporating an understanding of our national identity, constitutional heritage, civic values, and rights and responsibilities. (3) Skills attainment and social participation, which includes incorporating basic study skills, critical thinking skills, and participating skills that are essential for effective citizenship. (h) It is the intent of the Legislature to establish a schedule and process for the review and revision, as necessary, of the state's science and history-social science content standards. SEC. 2. Section 60605.85 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60605.85. (a) There is hereby established the Academic Content Standards Commission for Science and History-Social Science. The commission shall consist of 21 members, appointed as follows: (1) Eleven members appointed by the Governor. (2) Five members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (3) Five members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (b) Members of the commission shall serve at the pleasure of the appointing authority. (c) Not less than half of the members appointed by each of the appointing authorities pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be current public school elementary or secondary classroom teachers of science or history-social science. (d) The commission shall develop academic content standards in science and history-social science. The standards shall be internationally benchmarked and build toward college and career readiness by the time of high school graduation. (e) Pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code), all meetings and hearings of the commission shall be open and available to the public. (f) The commission shall present its recommended academic content standards to the state board on or before January 1, 2013. (g) On or before June 30, 2013, the state board shall do either of the following: (1) Adopt the academic content standards as proposed by the commission. (2) Reject the academic content standards as proposed by the commission. If the state board rejects the standards it shall provide a specific written explanation to the Superintendent, the Governor, and the Legislature of the reasons why the proposed standards were rejected. (h) The Superintendent and state board shall present to the Governor and to the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature a schedule and implementation plan for integrating the academic content standards adopted pursuant to this section into the state educational system.