California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB317 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/26/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 317AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Rubio FEBRUARY 14, 2011 An act to add Section 1506 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to fisheries. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 317, as amended, Rubio. Kings River Fisheries Management Program. Existing law authorizes the Department of Fish and Game to enter into contracts for fish and wildlife habitat preservation, restoration, and enhancement with public and private entities whenever the department finds that the contracts will assist in meeting the department's duty to preserve, protect, and restore fish and wildlife. Former law, repealed by its own provisions on January 1, 2011, adopted and authorized a fisheries management program described in the Kings River Fisheries Management Program Framework Agreement. That former law authorized the department to contribute up to 50% of any capital costs incurred by local agencies for the recreation and fish and wildlife features of the program. This bill would reenact those provisions, to be operative indefinitely, and would require that expenditures made pursuant to those provisions only be funded, upon appropriation by the Legislature, from  the Hatchery and Inland Fisheries Fund   moneys that are not from a General Fund or general obligation bond source  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1506 is added to the Fish and Game Code, to read: 1506. (a) The fisheries management program described in the Kings River Fisheries Management Program Framework Agreement, effective May 28, 1999, and amended June 26, 2009, is adopted and authorized. The department may contribute up to 50 percent of any capital costs incurred by local agencies for the recreation and fish and wildlife enhancement features of the program. (b) Expenditures made pursuant to subdivision (a) shall only be funded, upon appropriation by the Legislature, from  the Hatchery and Inland Fisheries Fund, created pursuant to Section 13007.   moneys that are not from a General Fund or general obligation bond source.