California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB333 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/25/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 333AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator La Malfa FEBRUARY 15, 2011 An act to add and repeal Section 22406.2 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 333, as amended, La Malfa. Vehicles: speed limits. (1) Existing law prohibits a person from driving  specified vehicles, including  a motortruck or truck tractor having 3 or more axles, or  any   a  motortruck or truck tractor drawing any other vehicle,  or a passenger vehicle or bus drawing another vehicle,  on a highway at a speed in excess of 55 miles per hour.  A violation of this requirement is a crime.  This bill would,  notwithstanding that prohibition,  until January 1, 2016, permit a person to drive  a truck tractor, commercial vehicle, or motor vehicle with an attached trailer   those specified motor vehicles  at a speed not to exceed 5 miles less per hour than the posted speed limit for a  motor vehicle on a 4-lane freeway or highway in a county located north of the County of Sacramento. Because the bill would expand the scope of a crime, it would impose a state-mandated local program   passenger vehicle on a specified portion of Interstate 5. The bill would require the Department of Transportation and the Department of the California Highway Patrol, on or before December 31, 2015, to submit a report to   the Legislature on traffic flow and traffic safety on t   hat portion of Interstate 5 .  (2) The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.   (3)   (2)  The bill would declare that, due to the unique geographic and demographic characteristics of counties located north of the County of Sacramento   the Counties of Shasta and Yolo  , a general statute within the meaning of specified provisions of the California Constitution cannot be made applicable and a special statute is necessary. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes  no  . State-mandated local program:  yes   no  . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 22406.2 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read:  22406.2. (a) Notwithstanding Section 22406 or any other contrary law, a person may drive a truck tractor, commercial vehicle, or motor vehicle with an attached trailer at a speed not exceeding five miles less per hour than the posted speed limit for a motor vehicle on a four-lane freeway or highway located in a county located north of the County of Sacramento.   22406.2.   (a) Notwithstanding Section 22406, a person may drive a motor vehicle described in subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 22406 at a speed not to exceed five miles per hour less than the posted speed limit for a passenger vehicle on Interstate 5 north of the City of Woodland, in the County of Yolo, and south of Cottonwood, in the County of Shasta.   (b) On or before December 31, 2015, the Department of Transportation and the Department of the California Highway Patrol shall submit to the Legislature, pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code, a report on the effects of subdivision (a) on traffic flow and traffic safety on the portion of Interstate 5 as specified in subdivision (a).   (b)   (c)  This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.  SEC. 2.   No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.   SEC. 3.   SEC. 2.  Due to the unique geographic and demographic characteristics of  counties located north of the County of Sacramento   the Counties of Shasta and Yolo  , the Legislature finds and declares that a general statute cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution. Therefore, the special legislation contained within Section 1 of this act is necessarily only applicable to those counties.