California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB416 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/16/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 416AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 17, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 103950) to Part 2 of Division 102 of the Health and Safety Code, related to health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 416, as amended, Kehoe. Health: survey. Existing law creates the State Department of Public Health and requires it to carry out various duties related to public health programs. Existing law creates the State Department of Health Care Services and requires it to carry out various duties related to health purchasing programs. This bill would require the State Department of Public Health and the State Department of Health Care Services to  collorborate   collaborate  with the  Regents of the  University of California  , Los Angeles  , to include specified information related to gender into the California Health Interview Survey. This bill would require the State Department of Public Health and the State Department of Health Care Services to  collorborate   collaborate  with the California state coordinator for the Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System to include specified information related to gender into the system. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 103950) is added to Part 2 of Division 102 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: CHAPTER 5. HEALTH CARE SURVEYS 103950. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of state law, and to the extent permitted by federal law, the State Department of Public Health and the State Department of Health Care Services shall, no later than January 1, 2013, collaborate with the  University of California, Los Angeles, to include appropriate   Regents of the University of California to include appropriate  voluntary self-identification information pertaining to sexual orientation, gender identity, and gender expression into the questions asked by the California Health Interview Survey. If the survey includes any question about marital status, the State Department of Public Health and the State Department of Health Care Services shall also, no later than January 1, 2013, collaborate  with the University of California, Los Angeles, to also include   with the Regents of the University of California to also include  questions about registered domestic partnership status and about the gender of the spouse or partner into the California Health Interview Survey. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of state law, and to the extent permitted by federal law, the State Department of Public Health and the State Department of Health Care Services shall, no later than January 1, 2013, collaborate with the California state coordinator for the Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System to include appropriate voluntary self-identification information pertaining to sexual orientation, gender identity, and gender expression into the system. If the survey includes any question about marital status, the State Department of Public Health and the State Department of Health Care Services shall also, no later than January 1, 2013, collaborate with the California state coordinator for the Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System to also include questions about registered domestic partnership status and about the gender of the spouse or partner into the system.