BILL NUMBER: SB 443AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 17, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 26, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 24, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Strickland (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Achadjian) (Coauthor: Senator Blakeslee) FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act relating to a veterans' memorial. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 443, as amended, Strickland. Veterans' memorial. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways. Existing law authorizes the department to enter into an agreement to accept funds, materials, equipment, or services from any person for maintenance or roadside enhancement. Under existing law, if the department determines that real property is no longer necessary for highway purposes, the department may sell or exchange the real property based on terms established by the California Transportation Commission. This bill would require authorize the Department of Transportation , if nonstate funds are available for this purpose, including for repair and ongoing maintenance, to erect a veterans' memorial in a specified state-owned park and ride parking lot in the town of Orcutt, in consultation with the Old Town Orcutt Revitalization Association. The bill would authorize the department to enter into agreements with the association for the planning, construction, and maintenance of the memorial. to sell excess real property in the state-owned area associated with the park-and- ride lot at the Clark Avenue West exit from State Highway Route 135 in the Town of Orcutt to the County of Santa Barbara for purposes of erecting a veterans' memorial. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the town Town of Orcutt. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Department of Transportation, if nonstate funds are available for this purpose, including for repair and ongoing maintenance, shall erect a veterans' memorial in the state-owned park and ride parking lot at the Clark Avenue West exit from State Highway Route 135 in the town of Orcutt, in consultation with the Old Town Orcutt Revitalization Association. The department may enter into agreements with the association for the planning, construction, and maintenance of the memorial. SECTION 1. Pursuant to Section 118 of the Streets and Highways Code, the Department of Transportation may sell excess real property in the state-owned area associated with the park-and-ride lot at the Clark Avenue West exit from State Highway Route 135 in the Town of Orcutt to the County of Santa Barbara for purposes of erecting a veterans' memorial at that location. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique need to erect a veterans' memorial in Orcutt in the town of a publicly accessible location. memorial in the Town of Orcutt in a publicly accessible location.