California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB541 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/13/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 541AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Price FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to  amend Sections 7000.5 and 7011 of   add Section 40 to  the Business and Professions Code, relating to  contractors   profession and vocations, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 541, as amended, Price. Contractors' State License  Board.   Regulatory boards: expert consultants.   Existing law provides for the licensure and regulation of various professions and vocations by boards within the Department of Consumer Affairs. Existing law, the Chiropractic Act, enacted by initiative, provides for the licensure and regulation of chiropractors by the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners. Existing law, the Osteopathic Act, requires the Osteopathic Medical Board of California to regulate osteopathic physicians and surgeons. Existing law generally requires applicants for a license to pass an examination and authorizes boards to take disciplinary action against licensees for violations of law. Existing law establishes standards relating to personal service contracts in state employment.   This bill would authorize these boards to enter into an agreement with an expert consultant, subject to the standards regarding personal service contracts described above, to provide enforcement and examination assistance. The bill would require each board to establish policies and procedures for the selection and use of these consultants.   This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute.   Existing law establishes within the Department of Consumer Affairs, until January 1, 2012, the Contractors' State License Board and a registrar of contractors, for purposes of the licensure and regulation of contractors. Under existing law, boards scheduled for repeal are required to be evaluated by the Joint Sunset Review Committee.   This bill would extend the operation of those provisions until January 1, 2016, and would specify that the board would be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.  Vote:  majority   2/3  . Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 40 is added to the   Business and Professions Code   , to read:   40. (a) Subject to the standards described in Section 19130 of the Government Code, any board, as defined in Section 22, the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners, or the Osteopathic Medical Board of California may enter into an agreement with an expert consultant to do any of the following: (1) Provide an expert opinion on enforcement-related matters, including providing testimony at an administrative hearing. (2) Assist the board as a subject matter expert in examination development, examination validation, or occupational analyses. (3) Evaluate the mental or physical health of a licensee or an applicant for a license as may be necessary to protect the public health and safety. (b) An executed contract between a board and an expert consultant shall be exempt from the provisions of Part 2 (commencing with Section 10100) of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code. (c) Each board shall establish policies and procedures for the selection and use of expert consultants.   SEC. 2.   This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are:   To ensure that licensees engaging in certain professions and vocations are adequately regulated at the earliest possible time in order to protect and safeguard consumers and the public in this state, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.   SECTION 1.   Section 7000.5 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 7000.5. (a) There is in the Department of Consumer Affairs a Contractors' State License Board, which consists of 15 members. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the repeal of this section renders the board subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.   SEC. 2.   Section 7011 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 7011. (a) The board, by and with the approval of the director, shall appoint a registrar of contractors and fix his or her compensation. (b) The registrar shall be the executive officer and secretary of the board and shall carry out all of the administrative duties as provided in this chapter and as delegated to him or her by the board. (c) For the purpose of administration of this chapter, there may be appointed a deputy registrar, a chief reviewing and hearing officer, and, subject to Section 159.5, other assistants and subordinates as may be necessary. (d) Appointments shall be made in accordance with the provisions of civil service laws. (e) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.