California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB607 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/19/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 607ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 23, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 27, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 24, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Walters (Coauthor: Assembly Member Harkey) FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add Section 13170.3 to the Water Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 607, Walters. State Water Resources Control Board: water quality: brackish groundwater treatment. Under the Porter-Cologne Water Quality Control Act, the State Water Resources Control Board and the 9 California regional water quality control boards are the principal state agencies with responsibility for the coordination and control of water quality in the state. The act requires the state board to formulate and adopt state policies for water quality control, and to formulate and adopt, and review at least every 3 years, a water quality control plan for the ocean waters of the state known as the California Ocean Plan. This bill would require the state board, on or before January 1, 2013, to either amend the California Ocean Plan, or adopt separate standards, to address water quality objectives and effluent limitations that are specifically appropriate for brackish groundwater treatment system facilities that produce municipal water supplies for local use. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13170.3 is added to the Water Code, to read: 13170.3. On or before January 1, 2013, the state board shall either amend the California Ocean Plan, or adopt separate standards, to address water quality objectives and effluent limitations that are specifically appropriate to brackish groundwater treatment system facilities that produce municipal water supplies for local use.