California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB628 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/31/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 628AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 31, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 9, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 29, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 31, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 9, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 22, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 4936 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to acupuncture. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 628, as amended, Yee. Acupuncture: regulation. Existing law, the Acupuncture Licensure Act, establishes the Acupuncture Board and makes it responsible for enforcing and administering the act, including licensing persons who meet specified licensure requirements. Under the act, licensees are titled "acupuncturists," and are authorized to perform designated activities pursuant to their license. The unlawful practice of acupuncture and any other violation of the act is a crime. This bill would make it unprofessional conduct for an acupuncturist to use the title of "Doctor" or use the abbreviation "Dr." in connection with the practice of acupuncture unless he or she holds a  license authorizing that use or a specified  degree  that is approved by the board for the use of that title  . This bill would also make it unprofessional conduct for an acupuncturist to use the title "Doctor" or use the abbreviation "Dr." without indicating the type of license  or certificate  that entitles him or her to use that title. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4936 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 4936. (a) It is unprofessional conduct for an acupuncturist to use the title "Doctor" or the abbreviation "Dr." in connection with the practice of acupuncture unless he or she possesses a license  or certificate  that authorizes the use or possesses an earned doctorate degree from an accredited, approved, or authorized educational institution as set forth under  Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 94760) of Chapter 7   Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 94800)  of Part 59 of Division 10  of Title 3  of the Education Code, which is in acupuncture, oriental medicine, a biological science, or is otherwise related to the authorized practice of an acupuncturist as set forth in Sections 4927 and 4937. (b) The use of the title "Doctor" or the abbreviation "Dr." by an acupuncturist as authorized  above   in subdivision (a)  without further indicating the type of license  , certificate,  or degree which authorizes that use, constitutes unprofessional conduct.