California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB644 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/15/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 644AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 15, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock  (   Coauthors:   Senators   Leno   and Runner   )  FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend  and repeal  Section 1720.4 of the Labor Code, relating to public works. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 644, as amended, Hancock. Public works: volunteers. Existing law defines "public works," for purposes of regulating public works contracts, as, among other things, construction, alteration, demolition, installation, or repair work that is performed under contract and paid for in whole or in part out of public funds. Pursuant to existing law, all workers employed on public works projects are required to be paid not less than the general prevailing rate of per diem, except as specified. Existing law governing public works does not apply to specified work performed by a volunteer, a volunteer coordinator, or members of the California Conservation Corps or a community conservation corps. Those provisions are effective only until January 1, 2012, and as of that date are repealed. This bill would extend the repeal of this provision to January 1, 2017. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1720.4 of the Labor Code is amended to read: 1720.4. (a) This chapter shall not apply to  work performed by  any of the following  work  : (1)  Any work performed by a   A  volunteer. For purposes of this section, "volunteer" means an individual who performs work for civic, charitable, or humanitarian reasons for a public agency or corporation qualified under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code as a tax-exempt organization, without promise, expectation, or receipt of any compensation for work performed. (A) An individual shall be considered a volunteer only when his or her services are offered freely and without pressure and coercion, direct or implied, from an employer. (B) An individual may receive reasonable meals, lodging, transportation, and incidental expenses or nominal nonmonetary awards without losing volunteer status if, in the entire context of the situation, those benefits and payments are not a substitute form of compensation for work performed. (C) An individual shall not be considered a volunteer if the person is otherwise employed for compensation at any time (i) in the construction, alteration, demolition, installation, repair, or maintenance work on the same project, or (ii) by a contractor, other than a corporation qualified under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code as a tax-exempt organization, that is receiving payment to perform construction, alteration, demolition, installation, repair, or maintenance work on the same project. (2)  Any work performed by a   A  volunteer coordinator. For purposes of this section, "volunteer coordinator" means an individual paid by a corporation qualified under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code as a tax-exempt organization, to oversee or supervise volunteers. An individual may be considered a volunteer coordinator even if the individual performs some nonsupervisory work on a project alongside the volunteers, so long as the individual's primary responsibility on the project is to oversee or supervise the volunteers rather than to perform nonsupervisory work. (3)  Any work performed by members   A member  of the California Conservation Corps or of Community Conservation Corps certified by the California Conservation Corps pursuant to Section 14507.5 of the Public Resources Code. (b) This section shall apply retroactively to otherwise covered work concluded on or after January 1, 2002, to the extent permitted by law. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2017, and as of that date is repealed.