California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB734 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/18/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 734INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Price FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 14838.1 of the Government Code, relating to small business. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 734, as introduced, Price. Small business participation goals. Existing law provides for various programs to encourage the participation of small businesses, as certified by the Department of General Services, in state agency contracts, and sets forth the duties of the Director of General Services and the directors of other state agencies in this regard. Existing law, in order to encourage the participation of small businesses in the construction of the state's infrastructure, as provided in specified infrastructure-related bond acts of 2006, requires each state agency, as defined, to establish a 25% goal for the participation of small businesses in the construction of the state's infrastructure, as provided in those bond acts, to advertise all upcoming opportunities to bid on contracts for projects funded by those bond acts, as specified, including bidding procedures, and to provide California small businesses with information regarding available training and technical assistance for understanding and bidding on contracts for projects funded by those bond acts. Existing law also requires each state agency that has awarded any contract financed with the proceeds of the infrastructure-related bond acts in the previous fiscal year to report to the Director of General Services on an annual basis on certain statistics regarding small business and microbusiness participation. Existing law, the California High-Speed Rail Act, creates the High-Speed Rail Authority to develop and implement a high-speed rail system in the state, with specified powers and duties. Existing law, pursuant to the Safe, Reliable High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Act for the 21st Century, approved by the voters as Proposition 1A at the November 4, 2008, general election, provides for the issuance of $9.95 billion in general obligation bonds for high-speed rail and related purposes. This bill would extend the application of the above-referenced small business participation goals and reporting provisions to the High-Speed Rail Authority relative to the Safe, Reliable High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Act for the 21st Century. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14838.1 of the Government Code is amended to read: 14838.1. (a) In order to encourage the participation of small businesses in the construction, alteration, demolition, repair, or improvement, of the state's infrastructure, as provided in the infrastructure-related bond acts of 2006  and 2008  , each state agency awarding contracts financed with the proceeds of these bonds shall do all of the following: (1) Establish a 25 percent small business participation goal in all contracts  it  financed with the proceeds of the infrastructure-related bond acts of 2006  and 2008  . (2) Advertise all upcoming opportunities to bid on contracts for projects funded by the infrastructure-related bond acts of 2006  and 2008  , described in subdivision (c), in the California State Contracts Register and include in the advertisement an Internet link to information for prospective bidders, including, but not limited to, general bidding procedures and how to properly prepare a bid for those contracts. (3) Provide information to California small businesses regarding training and technical assistance that is available to assist these small businesses in understanding and bidding on contracts for projects funded by the infrastructure-related bond acts of 2006  and 2008  , described in subdivision (c). (b) For purposes of this section, "small business" has the same meaning as set forth in subdivision (d) in Section 14837. (c) For purposes of this section, all of the following measures are deemed to be the infrastructure-related bond acts of 2006  and 2008  : (1) The Highway Safety, Traffic Reduction, Air Quality, and Port Security Bond Act of 2006 (Chapter 12.49 (commencing with Section 8879.20) of Division 1 of the Government Code). (2) The Housing and Emergency Shelter Trust Fund Act of 2006 (Part 12 (commencing with Section 53540) of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code). (3) The Kindergarten-University Public Education Facilities Bond Act of 2006 (Part 69 (commencing with Section 101000) of the Education Code). (4) The Disaster Preparedness and Flood Prevention Bond Act of 2006 (Chapter 1.699 (commencing with Section 5096.800) of Division 5 of the Public Resources Code). (5) The Safe Drinking Water, Water Quality and Supply, Flood Control, River and Coastal Protection Bond Act of 2006 (Division 43 (commencing with Section 75001) of the Public Resources Code).  (6) The Safe, Reliable High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Act for the 21st Century (Chapter 20 (commencing with Section 2704) of Division 3 of the Streets and Highways Code).  (d) For the purposes of this section, "state agency" includes each agency provided for in Section 12800 and each state entity included in Section 10335.7 of the Public Contract Code in which the head of the agency is appointed by the Governor.  For the purposes of this section, "state agency" also includes the High-Speed Rail Authority created pursuant to Section 185020 of the Public Utilities Code.  (e) This section does not require the expenditure of the proceeds of the sale of the bonds described in this section, except as permitted by the measure authorizing the issuance of the bond. (f) On or before August 1, 2009, and annually thereafter, each state agency that has awarded any contract financed with the proceeds of the infrastructure-related bond acts of 2006 in the previous fiscal year shall report to the Director of General Services statistics comparing the small business and microbusiness participation dollars for contracts funded by these bonds to the total contract dollars for contracts funded by these bonds.  The High-Speed Rail Authority shall report, pursuant to this section, on or before August 1, 2012, and annually thereafter, with respect to the bond act described in paragraph (6) of subdivision (c).  If an agency did not meet its participation goal, then the agency shall include in its report a plan of action to meet its participation goal during the current fiscal year.