California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB752 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/03/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 752AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 3, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 5, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Berryhill (Coauthor: Assembly Member Chesbro) FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section  3032   1065  to the Fish and Game Code, relating to entitlements. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 752, as amended, Berryhill. Entitlements: voluntary donations.  Existing law requires each person who takes birds or mammals in California to apply for, and be granted, a hunting license.   Under   existing law, all licenses, permits, tags, reservations, and other entitlements authorized by the Fish and Game Code are prepared and issued by the Department of Fish and Game.  Existing law authorizes specified persons to obtain tags or stamps for the taking of specific animals or aquatic species, if certain requirements are met. This bill would require that a person to whom a license, permit, reservation, tag, or other entitlement is issued pursuant to the Automated License Data System have the opportunity at the time of issuance to voluntarily release contact information to nonprofit conservation organizations, as defined, through means of a check-off box, or through other means the  Department of Fish and Game   department  determines to be appropriate. The bill would require the department to annually transmit contact information to the designated nonprofit conservation organization. The bill would authorize the department to impose a charge on a nonprofit conservation organization to recover the reasonable costs of administering these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section  3032   1065  is added to the Fish and Game Code, to read:  3032.   1065.  (a) A person to whom any license, permit, reservation, tag, or other entitlement is issued pursuant to the Automated License Data System shall have the opportunity at the time of issuance to voluntarily release his or her contact information to eligible nonprofit conservation organizations through means of a check-off box, or through other means the department determines to be appropriate. (b) A nonprofit conservation organization seeking to receive contact information pursuant to this section shall  , once every three years, submit   submit, once every three years,  a letter to the department providing evidence that it meets the criteria set forth in subdivision (e). If the department determines that the nonprofit organization is eligible, it shall include the entity in the check-off box or other means determined pursuant to subdivision (a). (c) The department shall annually transmit contact information collected pursuant to subdivision (a) to the designated nonprofit conservation organization. (d) The department may impose a charge on a nonprofit conservation organization included in the check-off box or other means determined pursuant to subdivision (a) that shall not exceed the reasonable costs associated with the administration of this section. (e) As used in this section, "nonprofit conservation organization" means a nonprofit organization, as defined in the Internal Revenue Code, that is registered with the Attorney General and determined to be eligible by the department that has goals and objectives directly related to the conservation and management of fish or game species, and, in the previous three calendar years, has entered into a contract or other agreement with the department to perform habitat or other wildlife conservation work, facilitate fishing or hunting opportunities for the public, or raise funds on behalf of the department, including the sale of hunting fundraising tags or related items. (f) Any advertising materials produced pursuant to this section are subject to Section 211. (g) The department may develop policies and procedures to implement this section, including, but not limited to, those specified in Section 1054.8.