BILL NUMBER: SB 754AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 19, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 13, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Padilla ( Coauthor: Assembly Member Norby ) FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 54029 to the Education Code, relating to school funding. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 754, as amended, Padilla. School funding: economic impact aid. Existing law provides economic impact aid funding to school districts based on the number of economically disadvantaged pupils and English learners enrolled in the school district. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to perform specified calculations to determine the amount of economic impact aid a school district receives for a fiscal year and further requires each school district to expend these funds for specified programs and activities. This bill would require a school district, as a condition upon of the receipt of economic impact aid funds, to post online and in an easily accessible location , its economic impact aid budget, as specified. The bill also would require the State Department of Education to determine, by July 1, 2017, whether each school district receiving economic impact aid funds is using proven methods of teaching English learners. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes no . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 54029 is added to the Education Code, to read: 54029. (a) As a condition upon of the receipt of economic impact aid funds, a school district shall post online and in an easily accessible location the economic impact aid budget for the school district and each school within the school district. (b) By July 1, 2017, the department shall determine whether each school district receiving economic impact aid funds is using proven methods of teaching English learners.