California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB764 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/20/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 764AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 3, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 30, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 12, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 4, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Steinberg FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 4686.21 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 764, as amended, Steinberg. Developmental services: telehealth systems program. Under existing law, the Lanterman Developmental Disabilities Services Act, the State Department of Developmental Services is authorized to contract with regional centers to provide supports and services to individuals with developmental disabilities. This bill would require each regional center individual program planning team to consider the use of telehealth, as defined, whenever applicable, for the purpose of improving access to intervention and therapeutic services for consumers and family members and for purposes of facilitating better and cost-effective services, as provided.  The bill would require the department to implement appropriate vendorization subcodes for telehealth services and programs.  This bill would require the department  , by December 1, 2017,  to  evaluate the efficacy and cost-effectiveness of providing services to consumers using telehealth, and, by December 31, 2017, to provide information to specified committees of the Legislature in order to evaluate the effectiveness and appropriateness of telehealth for providing services to regional center consumers. This bill would authorize regional centers to agree to participate in the evaluation of telehealth services by the department, and if a regional center agrees to participate in this evaluation, would require the regional center to provide to the department specified information, as requested by the department   provide to the fiscal and appropriate policy committees of the Legislature specified information that is provided voluntarily by regional centers relating to the provision of telehealth services  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to do all of the following: (a) Improve access to treatments and intervention services for individuals with autism spectrum disorders (ASDs) or other developmental disabilities and their families in underserved populations. (b) Provide more cost-effective treatments and intervention services for individuals with ASDs or other developmental disabilities and their families. (c) Maximize the effectiveness of the interpersonal and face-to-face interactions that are utilized for the treatment of individuals with ASDs or other developmental disabilities. (d) Continue maintenance and support of the existing service workforce for individuals with ASDs or other developmental disabilities. SEC. 2. Section 4686.21 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 4686.21. (a) (1) To improve access to intervention and therapeutic services for consumers and family members, including those from underserved communities, and for purposes of facilitating better and cost-effective services, each individual program planning team shall consider the use of telehealth, whenever applicable. (2) Telehealth shall be considered for parent trainings, including, but not limited to, trainings as specified in clause (i) of subparagraph (B) of paragraph (3) of subdivision (c) of Section 4685. (3) The State Department of Developmental Services shall implement appropriate vendorization  codes or  subcodes for telehealth services and programs. (4) Providers of telehealth services shall maintain the privacy and security of all confidential consumer information. (5) The provision of a service through the use of telehealth shall be voluntary and may be discontinued at the request of the consumer or, as appropriate, the consumer's parent, legal guardian, or conservator. If, at any time, a consumer or, as appropriate, the consumer's parent, legal guardian, or conservator requests to discontinue the provision of a service through the use of telehealth, the regional center shall convene an individual program plan review pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 4646.5 to determine alternative, appropriate means for providing the service.  (b) (1) The State Department of Developmental Services shall evaluate the efficacy and cost-effectiveness of providing services to consumers using telehealth.   (2) Regional centers may agree to participate in the evaluation of telehealth services by the department. If a regional center agrees to participate in this evaluation, the regional center shall provide to the department information, as requested by the department, on frequency, applications, cost-effectiveness, consumer and family satisfaction, and any other information deemed necessary by the department to evaluate the effectiveness and appropriateness of telehealth for providing services to regional center consumers.   (3)   (b)  By December  31,   1,  2017,  based on the information provided to the department by the participating regional centers, the department shall provide information to the appropriate fiscal and policy committees related to the cost-effectiveness and efficacy of providing services to consumers using telehealth   the department shall forward to the fiscal and appropriate policy committees of the Legislature any information that was provided voluntarily by the regional centers to the department that was deemed relevant by the regional centers to assess the effectiveness and appropriateness of providing telehealth services to regional center consumers through the individual program plan (IPP) process  . (c) For purposes of this section, "telehealth" has the same meaning as set forth in paragraph (6) of subdivision (a) of Section 2290.5 of the Business and Professions Code.