California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB827 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/24/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SB 827AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 24, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 4, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lowenthal FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 60902 to the Education Code, relating to pupil data. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 827, as amended, Lowenthal. Pupil data: California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System Advisory Committee. Existing law establishes the California Education Information System, which consists of the California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System (CALPADS) and the California Longitudinal Teacher Integrated Data Education System. Existing law requires the State Department of Education to contract for the development of proposals that will provide for the retention and analysis of longitudinal pupil achievement data, known as CALPADS. This bill would require the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish a California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System Advisory Committee to advise, and provide recommendations to, the Governor, Superintendent, State Board of Education, and Legislature on matters relating to CALPADS, as specified. The bill would require the advisory committee to consist of 23 members, as specified, and to be cochaired by the president of the state board and the Superintendent, or their respective designees.  The bill would provide that advisory committee members shall serve without compensation or reimbursement for travel or any other costs associated with service on the advisory committee.  The bill would require the advisory committee to report its recommendations regarding CALPADS to the Governor, Legislature, Superintendent, and state board by November 1, 2012. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60902 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60902. (a) The Superintendent shall establish a California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System Advisory Committee to advise, and provide recommendations to, the Governor, Superintendent, state board, and Legislature on all of the following: (1) The ability of CALPADS to serve local, state, and federal pupil data needs and compliance. (2) The steps necessary to expand CALPADS to create a comprehensive data system that tracks progress from preschool through postsecondary education and employment. (3) A review of CALPADS' objectives, usefulness,  longer term   long-term  implications, and compatibility with  increasing   increasingly  applicable federal requirements. (4) If and how CALPADS has been useful to pupils and their families, including, but not limited to, providing increased eligibility for, and access to, pupil services such as free and reduced-price lunches and pupil record transfers. (5) If and how CALPADS does or will save local educational agencies and the state time and money and result in higher quality pupil data. (b) The advisory committee shall consist of 23 members, as follows: (1) The Superintendent, or his or her designee, shall be an ex officio member. (2) The president of the state board, or his or her designee, shall be an ex officio member. (3) Seven members shall be appointed by the Superintendent. (4) Six members shall be appointed by the state board. (5) Four members shall be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (6) Four members shall be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (c) The advisory committee shall be cochaired by the president of the state board and the Superintendent, or their respective designees.  (d) Members of the advisory committee shall serve without compensation. Members of the advisory committee shall not be reimbursed for travel or any other costs associated with serving on the advisory committee.   (d)   (e)  Members appointed pursuant to subdivision (b) shall include representatives of each of the stakeholder groups necessary to consider the future of pupil data collection and the data and system's usefulness on a local, state, and federal level, including, but not limited to, parents, teachers, school administrators, researchers, the department, and the California Technology Agency.  (e)   (f)  On or before November 1, 2012, the advisory committee shall report its recommendations developed pursuant to subdivision (a) to the Governor, Legislature, Superintendent, and state board.  (f)   (g)  For purposes of this section, "CALPADS" means the California Longitudinal Pupil Achievement Data System developed pursuant to Section 60900.