BILL NUMBER: SB 835AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amendSection 10506.8Sections 10506.8 and 10506.9 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 835, as amended, Wolk. Public contracts: University of California: best value procedures: report. Existing law , until January 1, 2012, establishes a pilot program authorizing the University of California to award contracts based on the best value procedures, as defined. Existing law requires, on or before January 1, 2010, the Regents of the University of California to submit a report to the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature and the Joint Legislative Budget Committee regarding the pilot program, as specified. Existing law requires bidders to verify specified information under oath. This bill would require the University of California to submit a report on the pilot program before January 1, 2012. This bill would extend the pilot program until January 1, 2015. By extending the requirement that bidders verify specified information under oath, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program by expanding the scope of an existing crime. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program:noyes . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10506.8 of the Public Contract Code is amended to read: 10506.8. On or before January 1, 2012, the Regents of the University of California shall submit a report to the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature and the Joint Legislative Budget Committee. The report shall include, but is not limited to, the following information: (a) A description of the projects awarded using the best value procedures. (b) The contract award amounts. (c) The best value contractors awarded the projects. (d) A description of any written protests concerning any aspect of the solicitation, bid, or award of the best value contracts, including the resolution of the protests. (e) A description of the prequalification process. (f) The criteria used to evaluate the bids, including the weighting of the criteria and an assessment of the effectiveness of the methodology. (g) If a project awarded under this article has been completed, an assessment of the project performance, to include a summary of any delays or cost increases. SEC. 2. Section 10506.9 of the Public Contract Code is amended to read: 10506.9. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1,20122015 , and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,20122015 , deletes or extends that date. SEC. 3. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.