California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB952 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/14/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 952AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 14, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Alquist JANUARY 5, 2012 An act to add  and repeal  Section 89517.5  to   of  the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 952, as amended, Alquist. California State University: compensation. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in the state. This bill would prohibit, on or after July 1, 2012,  and until July 1, 2018,  the Trustees of the California State University from entering into, or renewing, a contract that provides for a compensation increase for any administrator  , as defined,  of more than 10% using General Fund moneys in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately past contract for that same position  , if in that same fiscal year there has been a tuition or fee increase  . This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89517.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89517.5.  (a)    On or after July 1, 2012, the Trustees of the California State University shall not enter into, or renew, a contract that provides for a compensation increase for any administrator of more than 10 percent using General Fund moneys in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately past contract for that same position  , if in that same fiscal year there has been a tuition or fee increase  .  (b) As used in this section, "administrator" includes, but is not limited to, the Chancellor of the California State University, a vice chancellor of the university, an executive vice chancellor of the university, the general counsel of the university, the trustees' secretary, and the president of an individual campus.   (c) This section shall become inoperative on July 1, 2018, and, as of January 1, 2019, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.  SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to respond to and alleviate the effects of the state's current fiscal crisis and the resulting additional budget cuts and tuition increases for the California State University, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.