California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB994 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/02/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 994AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Vargas FEBRUARY 2, 2012 An act to add Section 51204.6 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 994, as amended, Vargas. Pupil instruction: social sciences: California Latino history: California Latino Curriculum Committee. Existing law requires instruction in social sciences to include the early history of California and a study of the role and contributions of both men and women, Native Americans, African Americans, Mexican Americans, Asian Americans, Pacific Islanders, European Americans, lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender Americans, persons with disabilities, and members of other ethnic and cultural groups, to the economic, political, and social development of California and the United States of America, with particular emphasis on portraying the role of these groups in contemporary society. This bill would, before January 1, 2014, require the State Department of Education to establish the California Latino Curriculum Committee to be composed of specified individuals, for the purpose of developing California Latino curriculum that is consistent with the history-social science curriculum framework and state-adopted academic content standards for use in public schools maintaining any combination of instructional settings from kindergarten to grade 12, inclusive.  The bill would require the committee to, in the development of the California Latino curriculum, consult with the other groups of people whose roles and contributions to the early history of California are required to be included in instruction in social sciences and would require the committee to submit the curriculum to the State Board of Education for inclusion in the next revision of the history-social science curriculum framework.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51204.6 is added to the Education Code, to read: 51204.6. (a) Before January 1, 2014, the department shall establish the California Latino Curriculum Committee for the purpose of developing California Latino curriculum pursuant to Section 51204.5 that is consistent with the history-social science curriculum framework and state-adopted academic content standards for use in public schools maintaining any combination of instructional settings from kindergarten to grade 12, inclusive. (b) The California Latino Curriculum Committee shall  be composed of   include, but not be limited   to,  the following individuals: (1) The Director of the Center for the Study of Latino Health and Culture at the University of California, Los Angeles. (2) The senior curator of LA Plaza de Cultura y Artes. (3) A representative of the California Teachers Association. (4) A representative of the Association of California School Administrators. (5) A representative of the California Association of Latino Superintendents and Administrators. (6) The President of the California Latino School Boards Association. (7) A representative of the department. (8) A member of the Association of Mexican American Educators. (9) A member of the California Rural Network. (10) A superintendent of a northern California school district. (11) A superintendent of a southern California school district. (12) The San Diego Superintendent of Schools.  (13) A curriculum specialist.   (14) An instruction specialist.   (c) The California Latino Curriculum Committee shall consult with the other groups of people whose roles and contributions to the early history of California are required to be included in instruction in social sciences pursuant to Section 51204.5 in the development of the California Latino curriculum.   (d) The California Latino Curriculum Committee shall submit the California Latino curriculum to the state board for inclusion in the next revision of the history-social science curriculum framework.