California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR52 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/23/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 52INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Vargas JUNE 23, 2011 Relative to the Jaime Obeso Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 52, as introduced, Vargas. Jaime Obeso Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 8 in the City of El Centro as the Jaime Obeso Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Jaime Garcia Obeso, of the City of Imperial, passed away on June 7, 2011, when he was struck by an errant motorist while working on a stretch of State Highway Route 8 near the Sunbeam Rest Area for the Department of Transportation (Caltrans); and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso was born to Gregorio and Magdalena Obeso on January 25, 1958, in El Centro, California; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso attended Ben Hulse Elementary, Frank Wright Junior High, and Imperial High School. While at Imperial High School, he excelled in football and track, holding records in pole vault, and 4x100 relay; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso grew up in the City of Imperial gaining many friends throughout his life; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso married Maria Elena Sanchez on September 1, 1978, his sweetheart since the 6th grade when they met. Jaime and Maria Elena were best friends and the loves of each other's lives. They were happily married 32 years this year; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso worked for H.E. Wiggins and Sons for many years and later gained employment with Caltrans. He was known as a hard working employee and he received many awards during his service with Caltrans. His last promotion was as a Leadworker with the El Centro Travelway Crew; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso was well known in the community and was always there to help his friends and family; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso's hobbies included working on air conditioners, his new jeep, fishing, finding a deal at the swap meet, browsing eBay for the latest deals, and spending time with his grandchildren and family; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso loved his family and grandchildren very much. He will be remembered for making breakfast for his grandchildren every Sunday morning and for being quick to aid his friends and family whenever they needed him; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso had a great sense of humor. He was always joking and teasing his friends and family; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso was preceded in death by his father, Gregorio Daniel Obeso; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso is survived by the love of his life of 32 years, Maria Elena Sanchez Obeso of Imperial, CA; daughter, Ida Obeso; son Jaime Obeso Jr. and his wife, Priscilla Escalanti Obeso; grandchildren, Gianna Alyssa Navarro, Ricardo "Richie" Antonio Navarro, Jaime Gregorio Obeso, Nicholas Edward Navarro, Audrina Kyana Obeso, and to be born in August, Julian Albert Obeso; mother, Magdalena Obeso; brothers and sisters, David Obeso, Arturo Obeso, Carmen Obeso-Garcia, Daniel Obeso, and Gloria Obeso-Levy; and sisters-in-law, brothers-in-law, and numerous cousins, nieces, nephews, and loved ones; and WHEREAS, Even though Jaime Obeso is no longer with us, he will be watching over us every day and will always be remembered in our memories and hearts; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That in honor of the commitment of Jaime Obeso, who died in the line of duty, the Legislature hereby designates the one-fourth mile before the Sunbeam Rest Area and the one-fourth mile after the Sunbeam Rest Area six miles west of El Centro on State Highway Route 8 as the Jaime Obeso Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing the special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.