California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR52 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/16/2011

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 52AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2011 INTRODUCED BY  Senator   Vargas   Senators   Vargas   and La Malfa   (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   V. Manuel Prez   )  JUNE 23, 2011 Relative to the  Caltrans Highway Maintenance Leadworker  Jaime Obeso Memorial Highway  , the Caltrans Leadworker Gary Wayne Smith Memorial Highway, and the Caltrans Equipment Operator II Richard Gonzalez Memorial Highway  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 52, as amended, Vargas.  Caltrans Highway Maintenance Leadworker  Jaime Obeso Memorial  Highway.   Highway, Caltrans Leadworker Gary Wayne Smith Memorial Highway, and Caltrans Equipment Operator II Richard Gonzalez Memorial Highway.  This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 8 in the City of El Centro as the  Caltrans Highway Maintenance Leadworker  Jaime Obeso Memorial Highway  and would designate the Sunbeam Rest Area in Jaime Obeso's honor. The bill would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 99, north of the City of Chico, as the Caltrans Leadworker Gary Wayne Smith Memorial Highway, and would designate a portion of State Highway Route 5 in the County of San Diego as the Caltrans Equipment Operator II Richard Gonzalez Memorial Highway  . The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of  each of the  appropriate signs showing  this   these  special  designation   designations  and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering  that   the  cost  for a sign designation  , to erect  those signs   a sign  . Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Jaime Garcia Obeso, of the City of Imperial, passed away on June 7, 2011, when he was struck by an errant motorist while working on a stretch of State Highway Route 8 near the Sunbeam Rest Area for the Department of Transportation (Caltrans); and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso was born to Gregorio and Magdalena Obeso on January 25, 1958, in El Centro, California; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso attended Ben Hulse Elementary, Frank Wright Junior High, and Imperial High School. While at Imperial High School, he excelled in football and track, holding records in pole vault, and 4x100 relay; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso grew up in the City of Imperial gaining many friends throughout his life; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso married Maria Elena Sanchez on September 1, 1978, his sweetheart since the 6th grade when they met. Jaime and Maria Elena were best friends and the loves of each other's lives. They were happily married 32 years this year; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso worked for H.E. Wiggins and Sons for many years and later gained employment with Caltrans. He was known as a hard working employee and he received many awards during his service with Caltrans. His last promotion was as a  Caltrans Highway Maintenance  Leadworker with the El Centro Travelway Crew; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso was well known in the community and was always there to help his friends and family; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso's hobbies included working on air conditioners, his new jeep, fishing, finding a deal at the swap meet, browsing eBay for the latest deals, and spending time with his grandchildren and family; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso loved his family and grandchildren very much. He will be remembered for making breakfast for his grandchildren every Sunday morning and for being quick to aid his friends and family whenever they needed him; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso had a great sense of humor. He was always joking and teasing his friends and family; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso was preceded in death by his father, Gregorio Daniel Obeso; and WHEREAS, Jaime Obeso is survived by the love of his life of 32 years, Maria Elena Sanchez Obeso of Imperial, CA; daughter, Ida Obeso; son Jaime Obeso Jr. and his wife, Priscilla Escalanti Obeso; grandchildren, Gianna Alyssa Navarro, Ricardo "Richie" Antonio Navarro, Jaime Gregorio Obeso, Nicholas Edward Navarro, Audrina Kyana Obeso, and to be born in August, Julian Albert Obeso; mother, Magdalena Obeso; brothers and sisters, David Obeso, Arturo Obeso, Carmen Obeso-Garcia, Daniel Obeso, and Gloria Obeso-Levy; and sisters-in-law, brothers-in-law, and numerous cousins, nieces, nephews, and loved ones; and WHEREAS, Even though Jaime Obeso is no longer with us, he will be watching over us every day and will always be remembered in our memories and hearts;  now, therefore, be it   and   WHEREAS, Gary Wayne Smith began working for Caltrans on May 16, 1978, and spent the majority of his career at the Chico Maintenance Station; and   WHEREAS, On November 14, 2010, Gary Wayne Smith was struck and killed by a vehicle while performing traffic control at the scene of a fatal accident on State Highway Route 99 north of the City of Chico; and   WHEREAS, Gary Wayne Smith was known as a kind-natured individual who was never without a smile and who helped many coworkers on the job; and   WHEREAS, Gary Wayne Smith never hesitated to help or respond to callouts regardless of the time or day; and   WHEREAS, Gary Wayne Smith had great pride regarding his service to the State of California; and   WHEREAS, It is appropriate to dedicate a portion of State Highway Route 99 in honor of Gary Wayne Smith; and   WHEREAS, Caltrans Equipment Operator II Richard Gonzalez was a dedicated maintenance worker; and   WHEREAS, Richard Gonzalez, while working on a special programs crew at the connector of State Highway Route 15 and State Highway Route 94, was struck on the morning of June 20, 2011, and died in the line of duty at the age of 52 as a result of injuries sustained in the collision; and   WHEREAS, Richard Gonzalez was an exemplary employee who gained the respect of supervisors, management, and peers for his devotion to the values of integrity, commitment, and teamwork; and   WHEREAS, Richard Gonzalez's passion was restoration of classic cars and serving as a mentor and role model to his family and friends; and   WHEREAS, Richard Gonzalez, at the time of his death, was survived by his wife, Ruth, and his two sons, Ron and Erik; and   WHEREAS, It is appropriate to dedicate a portion of State Highway Route 5 in the County of San Diego in honor of Richard Gonzalez because he made the ultimate sacrifice in his service to the people of the State of California; now, therefore, be it  Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That in honor of the commitment of Jaime Obeso, who died in the line of duty, the Legislature hereby designates the one-fourth mile before the Sunbeam Rest Area and the one-fourth mile after the Sunbeam Rest Area six miles west of El Centro on State Highway Route 8 as the  Caltrans Highway Maintenance Leadworker  Jaime Obeso Memorial Highway; and be it further  Resolved, That the Legislature also hereby designates the Sunbeam Rest Area as the Jaime Obeso Sunbeam Rest Area; and be it further   Resolved, That the Legislature hereby recognizes the contributions and sacrifice made by Gary Wayne Smith to the people of the State of California and designates the portion of State Highway Route 99 from Garner Lane to Broyles Road, north of the City of Chico, as the Caltrans Leadworker Gary Wayne Smith Memorial Highway; and be it further  Resolved, That the Legislature hereby recognizes the contributions and sacrifice made by Robert Gonzalez to the people of the State of California and designates the portion of State Highway Route 5 between Dairy Mart Road and State Highway Route 905 in the County of San Diego as the Caltrans Equipment Operator II Richard Gonzalez Memorial Highway; and be it further  Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of  each of the  appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing  the   these  special  designation   designations  and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering  that cost   the cost of a sign designation  , to erect  those signs   a sign  ; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the  author   authors  for appropriate distribution.