BILL NUMBER: SCR 70ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 7, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 31, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 31, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 29, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Gaines (Coauthors: Senators Cannella, Fuller, La Malfa, Rubio, Runner, and Wyland) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Conway, Donnelly, Beth Gaines, Hagman, Halderman, Logue, Ma, Miller, Nielsen, Olsen, Silva, Wieckowski, Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Cook, Davis, Eng, Feuer, Furutani, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Grove, Hall, Harkey, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lara, Bonnie Lowenthal, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Portantino, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Wagner, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 24, 2012 Relative to the National Day of the Cowboy and Cowgirl. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 70, Gaines. The National Day of the Cowboy and Cowgirl. This measure would recognize and designate the 4th Saturday of every July, in perpetuity, as the National Day of the Cowboy and Cowgirl, and would encourage the people of the State of California to observe the day with appropriate ceremonies and activities. WHEREAS, Pioneering men and women together built the strong framework of this nation through their ability to develop farmland, establish ranches, and successfully provide the agricultural products that feed this growing nation and much of the world; and WHEREAS, The descendants of those pioneers, and those influenced by their endeavors, have continued that tradition and noble life's work; and WHEREAS, In California, the vaqueros and rancheros contributed significantly to our western heritage; and WHEREAS, Through cultural influence and the spirit of competition among those hardworking ranchers and farmers, often referred to as "cowboys" and "cowgirls," the rodeo was introduced to the West, defining a whole new branch of the ranching and farming experience; and WHEREAS, Through their hard work, honesty, and perseverance, cowboys and cowgirls have earned a reputation of integrity, patriotism, and a desire to preserve the uniquely American traditions of their trade; and WHEREAS, The young people of this country have embraced the lifestyle of the cowboy through organized activities such as Future Farmers of America, 4-H, and other educational endeavors to prepare them for their role in the ongoing cowboy lifestyle; and WHEREAS, Today's cowboys and cowgirls continue to strive to serve, preserve, and perpetuate this very foundation of America's heritage, not only through the efforts of working cowboys and cowgirls, but through the efforts of many statewide organizations that, each day, recognize the significance and value of the cowboy lifestyle; and WHEREAS, The cowboy and the cowgirl continue to be excellent stewards of this land and its creatures; and WHEREAS, The cowboy and the cowgirl continue to be vital parts of the nation, and in particular, the economy of this great State of California; and WHEREAS, Through determination and skill, commitment, and sacrifice, the vaquero, the ranchero, the farmer, rancher, cowboy, and cowgirl continue, and will continue, to produce the products that feed and clothe this nation; and WHEREAS, Through work and through play, in the movies or in the fields, raising crops, herding cattle, raising pigs or sheep, or bronc busting in a rodeo, the cowboy and the cowgirl are true American icons, worthy of recognition and honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes and designates the 4th Saturday of every July, in perpetuity, as the National Day of the Cowboy and Cowgirl; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages the people of the great State of California to observe this day with appropriate ceremonies and activities honoring those strong and honorable citizens of this state who, by their efforts and contributions, have earned the titles of "cowboy" and "cowgirl"; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.