California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1092 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/08/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1092AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Levine FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 18941.10 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1092, as amended, Levine. Building standards: electric vehicle charging infrastructure. The California Building Standards Law provides for the adoption of building standards by state agencies by requiring all state agencies that adopt or propose adoption of any building standard to submit the building standard to the California Building Standards Commission for approval and adoption. In the absence of a designated state agency, the commission is required to adopt specific building standards, as prescribed. Existing law requires the commission to publish, or cause to be published, editions of the code in its entirety once every 3 years. This bill would require the commission,  as a part of   commencing with  the next triennial edition of the California Building Standards Code adopted after January 1, 2014, to adopt  , approve, codify, and publish  mandatory building standards for the installation of future electric vehicle charging infrastructure for parking spaces in multifamily dwellings and nonresidential development.  The bill would require the Department of Housing and Community Development to propose mandatory building standards for the installation of future electric vehicle charging infrastructure for parking spaces in multifamily dwellings and submit the proposed mandatory building standards to the commission for consideration.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18941.10 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 18941.10. (a)  (1)     As a part of   The commission shall, commencing with  the next triennial edition of the California Building Standards Code (Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations) adopted after January 1, 2014,  the commission shall  adopt  ,   approve, codify, and publish  mandatory building standards for the installation of future electric vehicle charging infrastructure for parking spaces in multifamily dwellings and nonresidential development.  (2) For purposes of paragraph (1), the Department of Housing and Community Development shall propose mandatory building standards for the installation of future electric vehicle charging infrastructure for parking spaces in multifamily dwellings and submit the proposed mandatory building standards to the commission for consideration.  (b) In  proposing and  adopting mandatory building standards under this section, the  Department of Housing and Community Development and the  commission shall use Sections A4.106.6, A4.106.6.1, A4.106.6.2, and A5.106.5.1 of the California Green Building Standards Code (Part 11 of Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations) as the starting point for the mandatory building standards and amend those standards as necessary.