California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1096 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/02/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1096AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande (Coauthor: Assembly Member V. Manuel Prez) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to  amend Section 5151 of, and to  add Section 5162  to,   to  the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1096, as amended, Nestande. Vehicles: specialized license plates: Salton Sea. Under existing law, a state agency is authorized to apply to the Department of Motor Vehicles    (DMV)  to sponsor a specialized license plate program, and the  department   DMV  is required to issue those license plates if the agency meets certain requirements. Existing law also requires the  department   DMV  to charge specified fees for certain services related to the issuance of those plates. This bill would  include the Salton Sea Joint Powers Authority within the definition of state agency for the purposes of these provisions. The bill would  authorize the  authority   Department of Fish and Wildlife  to apply to the  department   DMV  to sponsor a special Salton Sea license plate program, and would require the  department   DMV  to issue the license plates if the  authority   Department of Fish and Wildlife  meets certain requirements. The bill would require the plates issued under the program to bear a full-plate graphic design, as specified, and would require the payment of an additional fee by a person applying for the special plate. The bill would also require the revenue generated from the license plates, as specified, to be deposited in the Salton Sea Restoration Account created by the bill in the Specialized License Plate Fund. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 5151 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5151. (a) As used in this article, "state agency" means a state office, officer, department, division, bureau, board, or commission, any other state body or agency, or the Salton Sea Joint Powers Authority. (b) It is the intent of the Legislature that this article contain the authority for specialized license plates for state agencies.   SEC. 2.   SECTION 1.  Section 5162 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5162. (a) The  Salton Sea Joint Powers Authority   Department of Fish and Wildlife  may apply to the department, pursuant to Section 5156, to sponsor a Salton Sea license plate program. The department shall issue specialized license plates for that program if the  Salton Sea Joint Powers Authority   Department of Fish and Wildlife  complies with the requirements of Section 5156. (b) Notwithstanding Section 5155, the Salton Sea license plates shall bear a full-plate graphic that the department determines, in consultation with the Department of the California Highway Patrol, does not obscure the readability of the license plate, and that depicts an image to be designated by the  Salton Sea Joint Powers Authority.   Department of Fish and Wildlife.  (c) Notwithstanding subdivision (c) of Section 5157, the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157 for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license plates shall be deposited, after the department deducts its administrative costs, in the Salton Sea Restoration Account, which is hereby created in the Specialized License Plate Fund.