California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB114 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/27/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 114AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 9, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 8, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Salas and V. Manuel Prez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Brown, Gomez, Holden, Perea, and Quirk-Silva) JANUARY 14, 2013 An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 26250) to Division 16.3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 114, as amended, Salas. Proposition 39: implementation: workforce development. The California Clean Energy Jobs Act, an initiative approved by the voters at the November 6, 2012, statewide general election as Proposition 39, made changes to corporate income taxes and, except as specified, provides for the transfer of $550,000,000 annually from the General Fund to the Clean Energy Job Creation Fund for 5 fiscal years beginning with the 2013-14 fiscal year. Moneys in the Clean Energy Job Creation Fund are available, upon appropriation by the Legislature, for purposes of funding eligible projects that create jobs in California, improving energy efficiency and expanding clean energy generation. Existing law, among other things, provides for allocation of available funds to job training and workforce development. Existing law appropriates $3,000,000 from the fund to the California Workforce Investment Board to develop and implement a competitive grant program for eligible community-based and other training workforce organizations preparing disadvantaged youth or veterans for employment. This bill would additionally require the California Workforce Investment Board to require a grant recipient to report to the board specified information. The bill would require the board, after the first year of implementation of the program, to review and assess the program in achieving the job training and workforce development goals, identify problems and barriers, and provide solutions to improve program performance. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 26250) is added to Division 16.3 of the Public Resources Code, to read: CHAPTER 6. JOB TRAINING AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT 26250. In addition to the requirements of Section 26230, the California Workforce  Development   Investment  Board shall do both of the following: (a) Require grant recipients to do both of the following: (1) Report to the California Workforce  Development   Investment  Board the number of individuals trained, their demographic and geographic profile, the number of training completions, the cost of training per individual, the number and type of credentials and certificates awarded, the number of trainees enrolled in state-certified apprenticeship programs, and the number of job placements and retention after six months for trainees and job characteristics of the placements, including industry, occupation, and wages and benefits. (2) (A) Disclose if the grant recipient is receiving incentives for energy efficiency or clean energy job training projects from other local, state, and federal programs. (B) A grant recipient's receipt of incentives from other local, state, and federal programs does not preclude the grant recipient from receiving, or reduce the amount of, a grant awarded pursuant to the competitive grant program developed pursuant to Section 26230. (b) Review and assess, after the first year of implementation of the competitive grant program developed pursuant to Section 26230, whether the program is achieving the job training and workforce development goals, identify problems and barriers to achieving those goals, and provide solutions to improve program performance.