California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1384 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/09/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1384CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 308 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2013 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2013 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 19, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 16, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Labor and Employment (Roger Hernndez (Chair), Alejo, Chau, and Holden) MARCH 4, 2013 An act to add Section 2676.55 to the Labor Code, relating to garment manufacturing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1384, Committee on Labor and Employment. Garment manufacturing: civil penalties. Existing law requires every person engaged in the business of garment manufacturing to register with the Labor Commissioner. Existing law requires every person registered as a garment manufacturer to display his or her name, address, and garment manufacturing registration number on the front entrance of his or her business, as specified. This bill would subject any person registered as a garment manufacturer who fails to display his or her name, address, and garment manufacturing registration number on the front entrance of his or her business, as specified, to a civil penalty, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2676.55 is added to the Labor Code, to read: 2676.55. (a) Any person who fails to comply with Section 2676.5 shall be subject to a civil penalty, for which a citation may be issued as follows: (1) For an initial citation, one hundred dollars ($100) for each calendar day that the person engages or has engaged in garment manufacturing, as defined in Section 2671, without complying with Section 2676.5. (2) For any subsequent citation, two hundred dollars ($200) for each calendar day that the person engages or has engaged in garment manufacturing, as defined in Section 2671, without complying with Section 2676.5. (b) If, upon inspection or investigation, the Labor Commissioner determines that a person has violated Section 2676.5, the Labor Commissioner may issue a citation to the person in violation. The procedures for issuing, contesting, and enforcing judgments for citations or civil penalties issued by the Labor Commissioner for a violation of Section 2676.5 shall be the same as those set out in Section 2681. (c) The civil penalties provided for in this section are in addition to any other civil or criminal penalty provided by law.