BILL NUMBER: AB 1530AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 2, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 17, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chau (Coauthors: Assembly Members Hagman and Olsen) JANUARY 17, 2014 An act to add and repeal Article 7 (commencing with Section 51300) of Chapter 2 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school curriculum. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1530, as amended, Chau. Model curricula: computer science. Existing law requires the adopted course of study for grades 1 to 12, inclusive, to include instruction in various areas of study, including, but not limited to, English, mathematics, and social sciences. Existing law requires the State Department of Education to adopt model curricula in certain areas of instruction, including, among others, driver education and training, gang violence suppression, and substance abuse prevention. This bill would require the Superintendent of Public Instruction to consideridentifying, developing, or, as needed, revising new or existingidentifying existing model curricula for kindergarten or any of grades 1 to 12, inclusive, on computer science, recommending for the revision of existing, or the development of new, model curricula for kindergarten or any of grades 1 to 6, inclusive, on computer science, andto submit,submitting, on or before July 1, 2017, the recommended model curricula to the State Board of Education for adoption. The bill, in addition to funds that may be appropriated by the Legislature for purposes of implementing the provisions of the bill, would authorize the Superintendent to seek out alternative nonstate funding sources to defray the cost of identifying, developing, or revising the model curricula. The bill would make these provisions inoperative on July 1, 2018, and would repeal them on January 1, 2019. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 7 (commencing with Section 51300) is added to Chapter 2 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, to read: Article 7. Model Curricula for Computer Science 51300. It is the intent of the Legislature to encourage the establishment of programs of instruction in computer science, with instruction beginning as early as feasible for each school district. 51301. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) Computer science is an established discipline at the collegiate and postgraduate levels, but the integration of computer science concepts into kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, curricula has not kept pace in the United States. (b) Computer science education is not just about access to computers or about preparing pupils to be passive users of technology, it is about preparing pupils to be innovative creators of new technologies. (c) Our educational system should prepare our pupils in kindergarten and grades 1 to 6, inclusive, with the fundamental computer science knowledge, skills, insights, and perspectives they need for future success and for a world in which computing is everywhere. While computer usage in classrooms is increasing, knowledge and familiarity about computing is not keeping pace. (d) The goal of computer science curricula in kindergarten and grades 1 to 6, inclusive, should be to introduce the fundamental concepts of computer science, including instruction on computational thinking, algorithmic processes and principles, hardware and software design, computer applications, and the impact of computers on society, and to increase the knowledge of computer science for all pupils, especially those pupils who are members of underrepresented groups. (e) The National Science Foundation and nonprofit organizations publish and maintain comprehensive computer science curricula for use in kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, that are free of charge to all persons. These curricula promote an introduction to, and an understanding of, the fundamental concepts of computer programming and coding. 51302. The Superintendent shall consideridentifying, developing, or, as needed, revising new or existingidentifying existing model curricula for kindergarten or any of grades 1 to 12, inclusive, on computer science, recommending for the revision of existing, or the development of new, model curricula for kindergarten or any of grades 1 to 6, inclusive, on computer science, andto submit,submitting, on or before July 1, 2017, the recommended model curricula to the state board for adoption. Upon adoption, the Superintendent shall make the model curricula available on the department's Internet Web site. 51303. In addition to any funds that may be appropriated by the Legislature in the annual Budget Act or another statute for purposes of implementing this article, the Superintendent may seek out, apply for, and accept nonstate funding sources to defray the cost of identifying, developing, or revising the model curricula pursuant to this article, including, but not limited to, federal funds, grant programs, and private funds. 51304. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2018, and as of January 1, 2019, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends that date.