BILL NUMBER: AB 2307AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 20, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Donnelly FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend add and repeal Section 52372.5 60603.5 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education. pupil assessment and academic achievement. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2307, as amended, Donnelly. Career technical education: linked learning programs. Common core academic content standards: school district opt out. Existing law provides for the development and adoption of common core academic content standards by the State Board of Education, and requires the state board to adopt curriculum frameworks and instructional materials that are aligned to those content standards. Existing law establishes the Measurement of Academic Performance and Progress for the development, adoption, and administration of assessments to pupils in elementary and secondary school that, among other things, assess the common core academic content standards. This bill, operative on July 1, 2015, would specify that a school district may opt out of any state statute or regulation that would require the use of common core academic content standards by that school district, including, but not limited to, curriculum frameworks, instructional materials, and assessments. The bill would require a school district that opts out pursuant to those provisions to use the academic content standards that were used in this state before the adoption of the common core academic content standards, and would also require the school district, at its own expense, to administer a standards-based achievement test pursuant to the former Standardized Testing and Reporting Program, which was repealed on January 1, 2014. The bill would make those provisions inoperative on July 1, 2020, and would repeal them on January 1, 2021. Existing law establishes the Linked Learning Pilot Program for the purpose of implementing districtwide linked learning programs, and defines linked learning program for purposes of those provisions. This bill would make nonsubstantive changes, including deleting obsolete reporting requirements related to linked learning programs. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no yes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60603.5 is added to the Education Code , to read: 60603.5. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a school district may opt out of any state statute or regulation that would require the use of common core academic content standards by that school district, including, but not limited to, curriculum frameworks, instructional materials, and assessments. (b) A school district that opts out pursuant to this section shall do the following: (1) Use the academic content standards that were used in this state before the common core academic content standards were adopted. (2) Administer the standards-based achievement test pursuant to the provisions of the former Standardized Testing and Reporting Program set forth in Section 60640, as that section read on January 1, 2013. A school district shall be responsible for all costs for acquiring and administering the test. (c) (1) This section shall become operative on July 1, 2015. (2) This section shall become inoperative on July 1, 2020, and, as of January 1, 2021, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SECTION 1. Section 52372.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 52372.5. For purposes of this article, a "linked learning program" is a program that is all of the following: (a) A multiyear, comprehensive high school program of integrated academic and technical study that is organized around a broad theme, interest area, or industry sector, including, but not necessarily limited to, the industry sectors identified in the model standards adopted by the state board pursuant to Section 51226. (b) A program that ensures that all pupils have curriculum choices that will prepare them for career entry and a full range of postsecondary options, including two- and four-year college, apprenticeship, and formal employment training. (c) A program that is comprised, at a minimum, of the following components: (1) An integrated core curriculum that meets the eligibility requirements for admission to the University of California and the California State University and is delivered through project-based learning and other engaging instructional strategies that intentionally bring real-world context and relevance to the curriculum where broad themes, interest areas, and career technical education are emphasized. (2) An integrated technical core of a sequence of at least four related courses, that may reflect career technical education standards-based courses, that provide pupils with career skills, that are aligned to and underscore academic principles, and to the extent possible fulfill the academic core requirements listed in paragraph (1). (3) A series of work-based learning opportunities that begin with mentoring and job shadowing and evolve into intensive internships, school-based enterprises, or virtual apprenticeships. (4) Support services, including supplemental instruction in reading and mathematics, that help pupils master the advanced academic and technical content that is necessary for success in college and career.