California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2308 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/26/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2308CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 607 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 26, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 23, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Stone (Coauthor: Assembly Member Skinner) (Coauthors: Senators Hancock and Mitchell) FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 3007.05 to the Penal Code, relating to prisoners. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2308, Stone. Prisoners: identification cards. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to issue an identification card to a person attesting to the true full name, correct age, and other identifying data as certified by the applicant for the identification card. Existing law also establishes the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to oversee the state prison system. This bill would require the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and the DMV to ensure that all eligible inmates released from state prisons have valid identification cards. The bill would define "eligible inmate" for this purpose to mean an inmate who has previously held a California driver's license or identification card, who has a useable photo on file with the DMV that is not more than 10 years old, who has no outstanding fees due for a prior California identification card, and who has provided certain other information verified by the DMV, including, among other things, the inmate's true full name and date of birth. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3007.05 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 3007.05. (a) The Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and the Department of Motor Vehicles shall ensure that all eligible inmates released from state prisons have valid identification cards, issued pursuant to Article 5 (commencing with Section 13000) of Chapter 1 of Division 6 of the Vehicle Code. (b) For purposes of this section, "eligible inmate" means an inmate who meets all of the following requirements: (1) The inmate has previously held a California driver's license or identification card. (2) The inmate has a usable photo on file with the Department of Motor Vehicles that is not more than 10 years old. (3) The inmate has no outstanding fees due for a prior California identification card. (4) The inmate has provided, and the Department of Motor Vehicles has verified, all of the following information: (A) The inmate's true full name. (B) The inmate's date of birth. (C) The inmate's social security number. (D) The inmate's legal presence in the United States.