California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB239 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/06/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 239AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 21, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hagman  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Chvez     and Maienschein   )   (   Coauthor:   Senator   Walters   )  FEBRUARY 5, 2013  An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 26230) to Division 16.3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.   An act relating to school financing.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 239, as amended, Hagman.  Energy: school facilities: energy efficiency upgrade projects.   School financing: common core implementation: broadband network.   Existing law establishes the Academic Content Standards Commission and requires the commission to develop academic content standards in language arts and mathematics and to present its recommended academic content standards to the State Board of Education. Existing law requires at least 85% of these standards to be the common core academic content standards developed by the Common Core State Standards Initiative consortium or any associated or related interstate collaboration. Existing law requires the state board to adopt or reject the academic content standards.   This bill would state the intent of the Legislature to appropriate an unspecified amount from the General Fund to equip all kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, schoolsites with broadband network infrastructure to help those schools with the implementation of the common core academic content standards.   The California Clean Energy Jobs Act, an initiative measure enacted by voters at the November 6, 2012, statewide general election, establishes the Clean Energy Job Creation Fund and requires moneys in the fund to be available for appropriation during specified fiscal years for, among other things, the purposes of funding energy efficiency retrofit and clean energy installation projects in schools and other public facilities.   This bill would establish the California Clean Energy School Fund in the State Treasury. The bill would transfer 50% of the moneys deposited into the Clean Energy Job Creation Fund to the California Clean Energy School Fund during specified fiscal years. The bill would require the Office of Public School Construction, in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission and the Public Utilities Commission, to expend moneys in the California Clean Energy School Fund, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to fund a zero-interest revolving loan program and a grant program for school districts to perform energy efficiency retrofit or clean energy installation projects at public schools. The bill would require a school district receiving an allocation from the office to provide to the office an inventory of the school district's facilities, and basic site and energy-related information for the facilities, which the office would be required to compile into a specified database. The bill would authorize the office, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to expend moneys in the California Clean Energy School Fund to develop the database.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to appropriate ____ dollars ($____) from   the General Fund, as a one-time appropriation, to equip all kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, schoolsites with broadband network infrastructure to help those schools with the implementation of the common core academic content standards.   SECTION 1.   Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 26230) is added to Division 16.3 of the Public Resources Code, to read: CHAPTER 5. IMPLEMENTATION 26230. (a) The California Clean Energy School Fund is hereby established in the State Treasury. (b) For fiscal years 2013-14, 2014-15, 2015-16, 2016-17, and 2017-18, 50 percent of the moneys deposited into the Clean Energy Job Creation Fund established pursuant to Section 26205 is hereby transferred to the California Clean Energy School Fund. (c) Moneys in the California Clean Energy School Fund shall, upon appropriation by the Legislature, be expended by the Office of Public School Construction, in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission and the Public Utilities Commission, to fund a zero-interest revolving loan program and a grant program for school districts to perform energy efficiency retrofit or clean energy installation projects at public schools. (d) (1) A school district receiving an allocation from the Office of Public School Construction shall provide to the office an inventory of the school district's facilities, and basic site and energy-related information for the facilities. (2) (A) The office shall compile the information provided pursuant to paragraph (1) into a database that will assist the office in achieving the purposes in subdivision (i) of Section 26206. (B) The office may, upon appropriation by the Legislature, expend moneys from the California Clean Energy School Fund for the purpose of subparagraph (A). (e) Excluding the moneys appropriated pursuant to subparagraph (B) of paragraph (2) of subdivision (d), the Office of Public School Construction shall expend moneys appropriated from the Clean Energy School Fund as follows: (1) Sixty percent for zero-interest revolving loans. (2) Forty percent for grants.