California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2547 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/15/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2547AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 15, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Beth Gaines FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section  18986.62   18986.60  of  , to amend the heading of Chapter 12.96 (commencing with Section 18986.60) of Part 6 of Division 9 of, an   d to repeal Sections 18986.61 and 18986.62 of,  the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and human services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2547, as amended, Beth Gaines. Placer County Integrated Health and Human Services  Pilot  Program. Existing law requires Placer County, upon approval of the county, and with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, to implement a pilot program for the funding and delivery of services and benefits through an integrated and comprehensive county health and human services system. Under existing law, these provisions become inoperative on July 1, 2016, and are repealed on January 1, 2017. This bill would  extend by 5 years the dates upon which the provisions relating to the Placer County health and human services pilot program would become inoperative and would be repealed.   delete the provisions making the program inoperative and providing for its repeal, thereby   extending that program indefinitely. The bill would delete obsolete related provisions and make other conforming changes.   This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for Placer County.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   The heading of Chapter 12.96 (commencing with Section 18986.60) of Part 6 of Division 9 of the   Welfare and Institutions Code   is amended to read:  CHAPTER 12.96. PLACER COUNTY INTEGRATED HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES  PILOT  PROGRAM  SEC. 2.   Section 18986.60 of the   Welfare and Institutions Code   is amended to read:  18986.60. (a) Placer County, with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, within the existing resources of those departments, shall implement a  pilot  program upon approval of that county, for the funding and delivery of services and benefits through an integrated and comprehensive county health and human services system. (b) The Placer County  pilot project   program  shall, in providing services through an integrated system to families and individuals, among other things, do all of the following: (1) Implement and evaluate a system of universal intake for those seeking services. (2) Implement and evaluate a system whereby a family or individual eligible for more than one service may be provided those services by as few as a single county employee, through an integrated, coordinated service plan. (3) Implement and evaluate a system of administration that centralizes the management and support of client services. (4) Implement and evaluate a system of reporting and accountability that provides for the combined provision of services as provided for in paragraph (2), without the loss of state or federal funds provided under current law. (c) The integrated system may include, but need not be limited to, any or all of the following: (1) Adoption services. (2) Child abuse prevention services. (3) Child welfare services. (4) Delinquency prevention services. (5) Drug and alcohol services. (6) Mental health services. (7) Eligibility determination. (8) Employment and training services. (9) Foster care services. (10) Health services. (11) Public health services. (12) Housing services. (13) Medically indigent program services. (14) All other appropriately identified and targeted services, except for dental care. (d) Programs or services shall be included in the  pilot project   program  only to the extent that federal funding to either the state or the county will not be reduced as a result of the inclusion of the services in the  project.   program.  This  pilot project   program  shall not generate any increased expenditures from the General Fund. (e) The county and the appropriate state departments shall jointly seek federal approval of the  pilot project,   program,  as may be needed to ensure its funding and allow for the integrated provision of services. (f) This chapter shall not authorize Placer County to discontinue meeting its obligations under current law to provide services or to reduce its accountability for the provision of these services. (g) This chapter shall not authorize Placer County to reduce Placer County's eligibility under current law for state funding for the services included in the  pilot project.   program.  (h) Placer County shall utilize any and all state general and county funds that it is legally allocated or entitled to receive. Through the creation of integrated health and social services structures, the county shall maximize federal matching funds. (i) The appropriate state departments that are assisting and cooperating in the implementation of the  project   program  authorized by this chapter shall have the authority to waive regulations regarding the method of providing services and the method of reporting and accountability, as may be required to meet the goals set forth in subdivision (b).  SEC. 3.   Section 18986.61 of the   Welfare and Institutions Code   is repealed.   18986.61. (a) Placer County shall evaluate the pilot program and shall prepare a final evaluation and submit the final evaluation to the Governor or the Governor's designee and the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature not later than six months following the third year of the implementation of the pilot program. (b) The county, with the assistance of the appropriate state departments, shall seek private funding to provide for the evaluation of the pilot program. The evaluation required by this section shall be conducted only if nonstate resources are made available for this purpose.   SEC. 4.   Section 18986.62 of the   Welfare and Institutions Code   is repealed.   18986.62. This chapter shall become inoperative on July 1, 2016, and, as of January 1, 2017, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.  SEC. 5.   The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution due to the unique circumstances of Placer County and the success of the Placer County Integrated Health and Human Services Pilot Program.   SECTION 1.   Section 18986.62 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 18986.62. This chapter shall become inoperative on July 1, 2021, and, as of January 1, 2022, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2022, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.