BILL NUMBER: AB 2555INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bocanegra FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add and repeal Section 33134 of the Education Code, relating to cradle-to-career initiatives. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2555, as introduced, Bocanegra. Cradle-to-career initiatives: report. Existing law establishes the Superintendent of Public Instruction and requires the Superintendent to develop, and submit to the State Board of Education for approval, information to strengthen and promote the opportunities for quality involvement by parents and guardians in schoolsite councils. This bill would require the Superintendent, in conjunction with specified entities, to develop a report exploring the feasibility of establishing and expanding cradle-to-career initiatives that are collective-impact strategies containing specified tenets. The bill would require the Superintendent to provide the Legislature with an interim status report by July 1, 2016, and to submit to the Legislature a final report by December 1, 2016. The bill would repeal these provisions on January 1, 2021. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33134 is added to the Education Code, to read: 33134. (a) The Superintendent, in conjunction with the State Department of Social Services, the Employment Development Department, the California Health and Human Services Agency, the Business, Consumer Services, and Housing Agency, the Department of Transportation, the California Children and Families Commission, the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, the Chancellor of the California State University, the President of the University of California, the Department of Parks and Recreation, teacher organizations, chambers of commerce, industry representatives, research centers, parent organizations, school administrators, representatives of regional occupational centers and programs, community-based organizations, labor organizations, and other interested parties deemed appropriate by the Superintendent, shall develop a report that explores the feasibility of establishing and expanding cradle-to-career initiatives that are collective-impact strategies with all of the following tenets: (1) Aligning local, state, federal, and private resources to maximize existing dollars and better serve children and their families. (2) Focusing coordinated efforts in one geographic location to target a specific scope of children and their families. (3) Sharing a focus on pupil success and mobilizing senior community leaders around a policy, program, and quality-improvement agenda. (4) Providing for partnerships among schools, government, and community-based organizations. (5) Providing for collaborative leadership structures that play an essential function in the alignment of planning, resource development, and implementation at both the school and community levels. (6) Coordinating improvements across multiple sectors, such as housing, education, employment, transportation, and health. (7) Selecting and targeting research-informed milestones, such as kindergarten readiness, third grade reading levels, and high school graduation rates, and focusing on the collective effort of partners in attaining these goals. (8) Providing for a results-driven focus on improving the educational and life outcomes of children, both to ensure brighter futures for young people and to create healthier, safer neighborhoods with greater access to employment opportunities. (9) Using the principles of equity and academic excellence to drive the initiative to meet the needs of all pupils, including those pupils identified as vulnerable to social disconnection and dropping out of school. (10) Reflecting local employment opportunities, needs, and objectives with input from, and coordination with, residents, community leaders, and local institutions. (b) In developing the cradle-to-career initiatives, the Superintendent shall consider approaches that include, but are not limited to, community schools, promise neighborhoods, and healthy communities efforts in the state. (c) The report shall include all of the following components: (1) Methods for developing and sharing models of cradle-to-career initiatives. (2) Strategies for effective implementation of the cradle-to-career initiatives. (3) Recommendations for supporting regional coalitions in planning and developing the cradle-to-career initiatives. (d) (1) The Superintendent shall, upon appropriation by the Legislature, use state and federal funds to implement this section. (2) To the extent that funding pursuant to paragraph (1) is insufficient, the Superintendent may apply for and accept grants, and receive donations and other financial support from public or private sources. (e) On or before July 1, 2016, the Superintendent shall, pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code, report to the Legislature on the status of completing the report. (f) On or before December 1, 2016, the Superintendent shall, pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code, submit a final report developed pursuant to subdivision (a) with recommendations to the Legislature. (g) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section shall become inoperative on December 1, 2020, and, as of January 1, 2021, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.