California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2591 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/23/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2591AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 23, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Weber (  Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Skinner   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Buchanan,   Maienschein,   and Skinner  )  (   Coauthor:   Senator   Hancock   )  FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Chapter 6.1 (commencing with Section 13710) to Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2591, as amended, Weber. Homeless youth: basic material needs assistance. Existing law establishes various public social services programs to provide protection, care, and assistance to the people of the state in need of those services, by providing appropriate aid and services to the needy and distressed. Existing law establishes homeless youth emergency service pilot projects in the Counties of Los Angeles, San Diego, Santa Clara, and San Francisco. This bill would create the Homeless Youth Basic Material Needs Assistance  Program and would   Program. This bill would  require that moneys appropriated by the Legislature for the purposes of the program be allocated proportionally  to counties  by the State Department of Social Services  to each county that elects to establish a program  based on the number of homeless youth in the county  , which is  to be used to establish  a   and operate the  program in the county. The bill would authorize a county to join with one or more other counties for the purpose of pooling their respective allocations and establishing a program for those  counties and would also require the department to retain the moneys allocated to a county and establish a program for that county if a county elects not to establish a program or requests the department to administer its program.   counties.  The bill would require each program to solicit proposals from and contract with nonprofit organizations for the purpose of providing basic material needs assistance to homeless youth in the county or counties as directed by the entity administering the program and would require contracted nonprofit organizations to consult with the children and family commission of the county or counties, as specified, if the entity administering the program elects to include homeless youth from birth to 5 years of age, inclusive, in its program. The bill would enact other related provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 6.1 (commencing with Section 13710) is added to Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: CHAPTER 6.1. HOMELESS YOUTH BASIC MATERIAL NEEDS ASSISTANCE PROGRAM 13710. This chapter shall be known, and may be cited, as the Homeless Youth Basic Material Needs Assistance Program. 13712. For purposes of this chapter, the following definitions apply: (a) "Administering entity" means one of the following: (1) A county that elects to establish a program and does not join with another county as described in subdivision  (c)   (b)  of Section 13714.  (2) The department, in the case of a county that elects not to establish a program or requests the department to administer its program.   (3)   (2)  The counties that elect to establish a program jointly under subdivision  (c)   (b)  of Section 13714. (b) "Basic material needs assistance" means school supplies, dental supplies and other hygienic products, shoes, clothes, blankets, and other basic material needs. (c) "Department" means the State Department of Social Services. (d) "Homeless  youth  " has the same meaning as that term is defined in Section  11302   11434a  of Title 42 of the United States Code. (e) "Nonprofit organization" means a nonprofit corporation qualified to do business in California and qualified under Section 501(c)(3) of the federal Internal Revenue Code. (f) "Program" means the Homeless Youth Basic Material Needs Assistance Program. 13714. (a) From moneys appropriated by the Legislature for the purpose of this chapter, the department shall allocate a proportional amount to each county  that elects to establish a program pursuant to this chapter  based on that county's respective number of homeless youth. The moneys allocated to the county shall be used to establish  and operate  a Homeless Youth Basic Material Needs Assistance Program for the county.  (b) If a county elects not to establish a program or requests the department to administer its program, the department shall retain the moneys allocated to the county pursuant to subdivision (a) and shall directly administer a program for homeless youth in that county.   (c)   (b)  A county may join with one or more other counties for the purpose of pooling the allocations made to the counties under this section and establishing a Homeless Youth Basic Material Needs Assistance Program for those counties. 13716. Each program established under this chapter shall do all of the following: (a) Solicit proposals from nonprofit organizations for the purpose of providing basic material needs assistance to homeless youth in the manner directed by the administering entity, subject to any requirements imposed by this chapter. (b) Contract with one or more nonprofit organizations to participate in the program based on the proposals solicited under subdivision (a). Selection shall be based on the nonprofit organization's demonstrated ability to meet the goals of the program, including, but not limited to, an ability to form partnerships with local education agencies (LEAs). (c) Require each nonprofit organization contracted under subdivision (b) to do all of the following: (1) Assist homeless youth through partnerships with LEAs, which shall be formed to provide basic material needs assistance to homeless youth. (2) Give priority to providing school supplies and dental supplies and other hygienic products to homeless youth. (3) Consult with the children and family commission of the county or counties served by the program to determine how to best provide basic material needs assistance to homeless youth from birth to 5 years of age, inclusive, if the administering entity elects to include homeless youth of that age in its program. (d) Encourage each nonprofit organization contracted under subdivision (b) to do both of the following: (1) Provide at least a 20-percent match for all moneys received from the administering entity under this chapter. (2) Work with the homeless liaison or liaisons of each LEA pursuant to  the federal Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act (42 U.S.C. Sec. 11301 et seq.),   Section 11432(g)(1)(J)(ii) of Title 42 of the United States Code,  or his, her, or their LEA-employed designee.