California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB284 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/24/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 284AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Quirk FEBRUARY 11, 2013 An act to add Section 25229 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 284, as amended, Quirk. Energy: Road to 2050 Board. Existing law establishes the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission and vests the commission with various authorities and duties regarding energy-related issues. This bill would require the commission to convene the Road to 2050 Board consisting of representatives from specified entities. The bill would require the board to contract with an independent research group to undertake specified studies regarding the achievement of a goal of reducing greenhouse gas emissions by 80% of the 1990 emissions level by 2050  (2050 goal)   , referred to as the 2050 goal  . The bill would require the board, on or before January 1, 2015, and every 4 years thereafter, to  prepare and   prepare,  adopt  , and submit to the Legislature  the Road to 2050 Report that includes specified information to provide  , on an advisory basis,  guidance for key infrastructure decisionmaking processes at the local and statewide level to ensure those processes adequately consider implications for meeting the 2050 goal. The bill would require the board to hold a public meeting, on a biennial basis, for the preparation of the Road to 2050 Report. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25229 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 25229. (a) To ensure that the interests of the people of California are served, the commission shall convene the Road to 2050 Board consisting of  representatives from  all of the following: (1)  The   A high   -level representative from the  commission. (2)  The   A   high   -level representative from the  Public Utilities Commission. (3)  The   A high   -level representative from the  State Air Resources Board. (4)  The   A high   -level   representative from the  California Environmental Protection Agency. (5)  The   A high   -level representative from the  Independent System Operator.  (6) The Governor's Office.   (6) Two members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly.   (7) Two members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules.  (b) The board shall do both of the following:  (1) (A) On or before January 1, 2015, and on or before January 1 every four years thereafter, the board shall prepare and adopt, the Road to 2050 Report containing findings that are used, on an advisory basis, to guide key infrastructure decisionmaking processes and policies at the local and statewide level to ensure those processes adequately consider implications for meeting the 2050 goals.   (B) The report shall contain all of the following:   (i) An overview of the overall reduction in emissions of greenhouse gases as a result of California's energy and environmental policies to date.   (ii) Consistent metric integration among the state agencies to ensure the analysis of the information included in the report is reliable and determines cost-effectiveness.   (iii) Milestones to represent the progress needed to achieve the 2050 goal, an evaluation of what is reasonably possible, and if a change in course of action is appropriate.   (iv) Alternative scenarios describing the best possible roadmap to achieve the 2050 goal in the most cost-effective manner.   (I) The scenarios shall be based on policies currently in effect and existing technologies and infrastructures at the time of the report.   (II) The scenarios shall contain separate roadmaps to determine the best processes toward the 2050 goal.   (III) The scenarios shall include a marginal cost curve analysis to better assess the cost-effectiveness of each given scenario.   (C) The board shall hold a public meeting, on a biennial basis, for the preparation of the report.   (D) The board shall submit to the Legislature, notwithstanding Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, and pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code, the report and identify statutory changes, policy gaps, limitations in statutes, or conflicting policies among state agencies that are needed to optimize the objectives of the state's energy and environmental policies.   (E) The board may contract with an independent research group to prepare the report.   (1)   (   2)  Contract with an independent research group to focus on a study to determine the best process for meeting the 2050 goal to include all of the following: (A) The best process for reducing carbon emissions from electrical generation that ensure cost-effectiveness and reliability. (B) Methods to reduce emissions of greenhouse gases from homes, farms, and industrial and commercial structures. (C) Emission reductions from sources of transportation.  (2) Submit to the Legislature, pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code, findings made pursuant to paragraph (1) and identify statutory changes, policy gaps, and conflicting policies among state agencies that are needed to optimize the objectives of the state's energy and environmental policies.   (c) (1) On or before January 1, 2015, and on January 1 of every four years thereafter, the board shall prepare and adopt the Road to 2050 Report to provide guidance for key infrastructure decisionmaking processes at the local and statewide level to ensure those processes adequately consider implications for meeting the 2050 goal.   (2) The report shall contain all of the following:   (A) An overview of the overall reduction is emission of greenhouse gases as a result of California's energy and environmental policies.   (B) Consistent metric integration among the state agencies to ensure the analysis of the information included in the report is reliable and determines cost-effectiveness.   (C) Milestones to represent the progress made towards the 2050 goal and a determination if a change in course of action is appropriate.   (D) Different scenarios describing the best possible roadmap to achieve the 2050 goal.   (i) The scenarios shall be based on policies in effect, and existing technologies and infrastructures at the time of the report.   (ii) The scenarios shall contain separate roadmaps to determine the best process towards the 2050 goal.   (iii) The scenarios shall include a marginal cost curve analysis to better assess the cost-effectiveness of each given scenario.   (3) The board may contract with an independent research group to prepare the report.   (d) The board shall hold a public hearing, on a biennial basis, for the preparation of the Road to 2050 Report.   (e)   (   c)  For the purposes of this section, "2050 goal" means the goal of reducing emissions of greenhouse gases by 80 percent from 1990 emission levels by 2050.