BILL NUMBER: AB 293AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Allen FEBRUARY 11, 2013 An act to amend Section 321.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy. add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 26230) to Division 16.3 of, and to repeal Section 26232 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 293, as amended, Allen. Energy: distributed energy generation: study. California Clean Energy Jobs Act: implementation. The California Clean Energy Jobs Act, an initiative enacted by voters at the November 6, 2012, statewide general election as Proposition 39, establishes the Clean Energy Job Creation Fund and requires moneys in the fund be available for appropriation during specified fiscal years for the purposes of funding specified energy-related projects in school facilities and other public facilities and projects related to job training and workforce development for energy efficiency and clean energy projects, and providing assistance to local governments in establishing public-private partnerships that provide specified financial and technical assistance for cost-effective retrofits. This bill would require the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, in consultation with the Public Utilities Commission and other appropriate state agencies, to develop a program to award financial assistance for the above-described purposes. The bill would require the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, on or before July 1, 2016, to submit to the Legislature a report on the progress of the program, the applicants for funding, the exact disbursements of funds and to whom, and recommendations to improve the allocation of moneys in the fund. Existing law requires the Public Utilities Commission (PUC), on or before January 1, 2010, and biennially thereafter, in consultation with the Independent System Operator and the Energy Commission, to study, and submit a report to the Legislature and the Governor, on the impacts of distributed energy generation on the state's distribution and transmission grid. Existing law requires the PUC to specifically assess the impacts of the California Solar Initiative program and the self-generation incentive program. This bill would make a technical, nonsubstantive change to this provision. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no yes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 26230) is added to Division 16.3 of the Public Resources Code , to read: CHAPTER 5. IMPLEMENTATION 26230. For the purposes of this chapter, "commission" means the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission. 26231. The commission, in consultation with the Public Utilities Commission and other state agencies deemed appropriate by the commission, shall develop a program to award funding, on a competitive basis, for purposes specified in Section 26205 in accordance with the requirements of Section 26206. 26232. (a) On or before July 1, 2016, the commission shall submit to the Legislature, pursuant to Section 9795 of the Government Code, a report on the progress of the program developed pursuant to Section 26231, the applicants applying for funding under the program, the exact disbursement of funds and to whom, and recommendations to improve the allocation of moneys in the Job Creation Fund. (b) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2021. SECTION 1. Section 321.7 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 321.7. (a) On or before January 1, 2010, and biennially thereafter, the commission, in consultation with the Independent System Operator and the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, shall study, and submit a report to the Legislature and the Governor, on the impacts of distributed energy generation on the state's distribution and transmission grid. The study shall evaluate all of the following: (1) Reliability and transmission issues related to connecting distributed energy generation to the local distribution networks and regional grid. (2) Issues related to grid reliability and operation, including interconnection, and the position of federal and state regulators toward distributed energy accessibility. (3) The effect on overall grid operation of various distributed energy generation sources. (4) Barriers affecting the connection of distributed energy to the state's grid. (5) Emerging technologies related to distributed energy generation interconnection. (6) Interconnection issues that may arise for the Independent System Operator and local distribution companies. (7) The effect on peak demand for electricity. (b) In addition, the commission shall specifically assess the impacts of the California Solar Initiative program, specified in Section 2851 and Section 25783 of the Public Resources Code and the self-generation incentive program authorized by Section 379.6.