BILL NUMBER: AB 337AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Allen FEBRUARY 13, 2013 An act to amend Section 13996.55 of the Government Code, relating to economic development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 337, as amended, Allen. Economic development: international trade and investment strategy. Existing law requires the Director of the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development to provide to the Legislature, no later than February 1, 2014, a strategy for international trade and investment that includes, among other things, policy goals, objectives, and recommendations for a comprehensive international trade and investment program for the state, and an identified organizational structure for the state administration of international trade and investment policies, programs, and services, as specified. This bill would change that date to February 1, 2019, and additionally require the strategy to include an evaluation of the ports of entry to the state and their capacity for handling international trade, including industrial and postconsumer secondary material, originating from or destined for other states. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13996.55 of the Government Code is amended to read: 13996.55. (a) The Director of the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development shall provide to the Legislature, not later than February 1,20142019 , a strategy for international trade and investment that, at a minimum, includes all of the following: (1) Policy goals, objectives, and recommendations necessary to implement a comprehensive international trade and investment program for the State of California. This information shall be provided in a fashion that clearly indicates priority within the overall strategy. (2) Measurable outcomes and timelines for the goals, objectives, and actions for the international trade and investment program. (3) Identification of impediments for achieving goals and objectives. (4) Identification of key stakeholder partnerships that will be used in implementing the strategy. (5) Identification of options for funding recommended actions. (6) Identification of an international trade and investment organizational structure for the state administration of international trade and investment policies, programs, and services. (7) Evaluation of the ports of entry to the state and their capacity for handling international trade, including industrial and postconsumer secondary material, originated in or destined for other states. (b) The strategy shall be submitted to the Chief Clerk of the Assembly and the Secretary of the Senate. A copy of the strategy shall be provided to the Speaker of the Assembly, the President pro Tempore of the Senate, and the chairs of the Assembly Committee on Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy and the Senate Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development, or the successor committees with jurisdiction over international trade and economic development programs. (c) The strategy shall be updated pursuant to the procedures of this section at least once every five years.