California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB468 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/01/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 468AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chesbro (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Levine, and Stone) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Atkins) FEBRUARY 19, 2013 An act to add Section 16031 to the Insurance Code, and to repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 4210) of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to  insurance.   insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 468, as amended, Chesbro. Insurance: Disaster Management, Preparedness, and Assistance Surcharge. Existing law required, by September 1, 2011, the State Board of Forestry and Fire Protection to adopt emergency regulations to establish a fire prevention fee of not more than $150 for the necessary fire prevention activities of the state that benefit the owners of structures within a state responsibility area. This bill would repeal the fire prevention fee. The bill would create the Disaster Management, Preparedness, and Assistance Fund in the State Treasury. The bill would require insureds to pay a special purpose surcharge, the Disaster Management, Preparedness, and Assistance Surcharge, on each commercial and residential fire and multiperil insurance policy issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2014, equivalent to 4.8% of the premium written on residential fire and multiperil insurance or the property exposure for commercial policies in California. Moneys from this surcharge would be deposited in the fund and be appropriated by the Legislature for the purposes of funding emergency activities of the Office of Emergency Services, the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, and the Military Department, as well as local governments for disaster planning and response. The bill would also require every admitted insurance company in the state to collect the surcharge and separately identify the surcharge on each affected insurance policy.  This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute.  Vote:  majority   2/3  . Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 16031 is added to the Insurance Code, to read: 16031. (a) The Disaster Management, Preparedness, and Assistance Fund is hereby created in the State Treasury. Funds received by the Office of Emergency Services pursuant to this section shall be deposited into this fund. Funds deposited into this fund shall be appropriated by the Legislature for the purposes of funding emergency activities of the Office of Emergency Services, the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, and the Military Department, as well as to local governments for disaster planning and response. (b) Insureds shall pay a special purpose surcharge on each commercial and residential fire and multiperil insurance policy issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2014, equivalent to 4.8 percent of the premium written on residential fire and multiperil insurance or the property exposure for commercial policies in California. The Disaster Management, Preparedness, and Assistance Surcharge shall only be applied to new business and renewal transactions. No adjustment shall be made for midterm increases or decreases in exposure or coverage. The amount of the surcharge shall be calculated to the nearest dollar. Notwithstanding any other law, failure to collect the surcharge from insureds prior to January 1, 2015, shall not result in a penalty, fine, or other liability. (c) Every admitted insurer in this state shall collect the surcharge fee specified in subdivision (b), which shall be separately identified on each policy, with respect to residential fire and multiperil insurance and the property portion of commercial policies. (d) Funds received as a result of the surcharge imposed on insureds as a percentage of premiums written on residential fire and multiperil insurance and property exposure for commercial insurance policies shall be remitted by the admitted insurers to the Office of Emergency Services, or other state agency designated to collect the surcharge on behalf of the Office of Emergency Services, within 45 days following the end of each calendar quarter. SEC. 2. Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 4210) of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code is repealed.  SEC. 3.  This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are:   In order to make necessary statutory changes to improve the state' s ability to respond to potentially devastating and deadly emergencies at the earliest time possible, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.