California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB49 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/19/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 49AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 18, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Buchanan (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Perea and Quirk-Silva) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Bigelow, Bloom, Blumenfield, Bocanegra, Bonilla, Bonta, Bradford, Brown, Ian Calderon, Campos, Chau, Chvez, Chesbro, Conway, Cooley, Dahle, Daly, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eggman, Fong, Fox, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Garcia, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gorell, Gray, Hagman, Hall, Harkey, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Levine, Linder, Logue, Maienschein, Mansoor, Medina, Melendez, Mitchell, Morrell, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nestande, Olsen, Pan, Patterson, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Quirk, Rendon, Salas, Skinner, Stone, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wieckowski, Wilk, Williams, and Yamada) (Coauthors: Senators Beall, Block, Cannella, Corbett, Correa, Emmerson,  Evans,  Fuller, Gaines, Hancock, Jackson, Knight, Pavley, Torres, Wright, and Yee) DECEMBER 21, 2012 An act to add Section 5156.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to license plates. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 49, as amended, Buchanan. License plates: breast cancer awareness. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to issue specialty license plates, including environmental license plates and specified special environmental design license plates. Under existing law, a state agency is authorized to apply to the DMV to sponsor a specialized license plate program, and the DMV is required to issue those license plates if the agency meets certain requirements. The DMV is required to charge specified fees for certain services related to the issuance of those plates. Existing law establishes the Breast Cancer Control Account in the Breast Cancer Fund, and requires that funds in that account, upon appropriation by the Legislature, be allocated for the provision of early breast cancer detection services for uninsured and underinsured women. This bill would require the State Department of Health Care Services to apply to sponsor a breast cancer awareness license plate program, and would require the DMV to issue the license plates if the State Department of Health Care Services meets certain requirements. The bill would  authorize the State Department of Health Care Services to accept and use donated artwork from California artists for the license plate, and   require that license plates issued under the program consist of a breast cancer awareness ribbon and message, as specified, on a light pink background that the Department of the California Highway Patrol determines does not obscure the readability of the license plate. The bill  would require the revenue generated from the license plates, as specified, to be deposited in the Breast Cancer Control Account  in the Breast Cancer Fund  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5156.5 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5156.5. (a) The State Department of Health Care Services  , in promotion of its mission to preserve and improve the health of all Californians,  shall apply to the department, pursuant to Section 5156, to sponsor a breast cancer awareness license plate program. The department shall issue specialized license plates for that program if the State Department of Health Care Services complies with the requirements of Section 5156.  (b) The State Department of Health Care Services may accept and use donated artwork from California artists for the license plate.   (b) In accordance with Section 5155, the license plates issued pursuant to this section shall consist of a pink breast cancer awareness ribbon to the left of the numerical series and a breast cancer awareness message to the bottom of the numerical series. Additionally, the license plates shall have a light pink background that the Department of the California Highway Patrol determines does not obscure the readability of the license plates.  (c) Notwithstanding subdivision (c) of Section 5157, the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157 for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license plates shall be deposited, after the department deducts its administrative costs, in the Breast Cancer Control Account  in the Breast Cancer Fund  established pursuant to Section 30461.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code.