BILL NUMBER: AB 494INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member V. Manuel Prez FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act to amend Section 2053.1 of, and to add Section 2053.2 to, the Penal Code, relating to prisoners. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 494, as introduced, V. Manuel Prez. Prisoners: literacy and education. Existing law requires the Secretary of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to implement in every state prison literacy programs that are designed to ensure that, upon parole, inmates are able to achieve a 9th grade reading level. Existing law further requires the department to prepare an implementation plan for the literacy programs and to request sufficient funds to make the programs available to a certain percentage of inmates by specified dates. This bill would require the department to request sufficient funding to make the literacy programs available to 75% of inmates by January 1, 2016. The bill would also require the Secretary of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to implement in every state prison educational programs designed to ensure that, upon parole, inmates are able to acquire a high school diploma, or its equivalent. The department would also be required to prepare an implementation plan for the educational programs and to request sufficient funds to make the programs available to a certain percentage of inmates by specified dates. This bill would also make a technical, nonsubstantive change to these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2053.1 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 2053.1. (a) TheDirector of the Department of CorrectionsSecretary of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall implement in every state prison literacy programs that are designed to ensure that upon parole inmates are able to achieve a ninth-grade reading level. The department shall prepare an implementation plan for this program, and shall request the necessary funds to implement this program as follows:(a)(1) To make the program available to at least 25 percent of eligible inmates in the state prison system by July 1, 1991.(b)(2) To make the program available to at least 60 percent of eligible inmates in the state prison system by January 1, 1996. (3) To make the program available to at least 75 percent of eligible inmates in the state prison system by January 1, 2016.In(b) In complying with the requirements of this section, the department shall give strong consideration tocomputer assistedcomputer-assisted training and other innovations which have proven to be effective in reducing illiteracy of disadvantaged adults. SEC. 2. Section 2053.2 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 2053.2. (a) The Secretary of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall implement in every state prison educational programs that are designed to ensure that upon parole inmates are able to acquire a high school diploma or its equivalent. The department shall prepare an implementation plan for this program, and shall request the necessary funds to implement this program as follows: (1) To make the program available to at least 25 percent of eligible inmates in the state prison system by July 1, 2016. (2) To make the program available to at least 60 percent of eligible inmates in the state prison system by January 1, 2019. (3) To make the program available to at least 75 percent of eligible inmates in the state prison system by January 1, 2022. (b) In complying with the requirements of this section, the department shall give strong consideration to computer-assisted training and other innovations which have proven to be effective in teaching and educating disadvantaged adults.