California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB498 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/07/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 498AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chvez FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act to add Section 14166.156 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 498, as amended, Chvez. Medi-Cal. Existing law provides for the Medi-Cal program, which is administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, under which qualified low-income individuals receive health care services. The Medi-Cal program is, in part, governed and funded by federal Medicaid Program provisions. Existing law, subject to federal approval, modifies the inpatient fee-for-service reimbursement methodology for nondesignated public hospitals, as defined, under a specified demonstration project for services on or after July 1, 2012. This bill would prohibit a payment made to a nondesignated public hospital pursuant to these provisions from being subject to  payment limitations   a peer grouping   inpatient reimbursement limitation  established by the department, unless otherwise required by federal law. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14166.156 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 14166.156. If a payment to a nondesignated public hospital is made pursuant to Section 14166.151, the reimbursement shall not be subject to  payment limitations   a peer grouping inpatient reimbursement limitation  established by the department, unless otherwise required by federal law.