California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB503 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/19/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 503AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 19, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wieckowski FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act to add  Section   Sections  11011.29  and 11011.30  to the Government Code, relating to state property, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 503, as amended, Wieckowski.  State surplus property: disposition:  Agnews Developmental  Center: transfer of title.   Center.  Existing law requires the Department of General Services to offer for sale land that is declared excess or is declared surplus by the Legislature, and that is not needed by any state agency, to local agencies and private entities and individuals, subject to specified conditions. This bill would authorize the Director of General Services to transfer  surplus state real property, or any portion thereof, to a local agency at a price that is less than fair market value, if the property to be transferred will be used solely for public school purposes. The bill additionally would authorize the director to enter into negotiations with the Santa Clara Unified School District, the City of San Jose, or both, to transfer  title  of all or a portion  of the former Agnews Developmental Center to the  Santa Clara Unified School District   district, the city, or both, to be used  for educational  purposes at fair market value   purposes, pursuant to the bill's authorization and existing law  , as specified. The California Constitution provides that the proceeds from the sale of surplus state property be used to pay the principal and interest on bonds issued pursuant to the Economic Recovery Bond Act until the principal and interest on those bonds are fully paid, after which these proceeds are required to be deposited into the Special Fund for Economic Uncertainties. Existing statutory law similarly requires that the net proceeds received from any real property disposition be paid into the Deficit Recovery Bond Retirement Sinking Fund Subaccount, a continuously appropriated fund, until the bonds issued pursuant to the act are retired. By increasing the amount transferred into a continuously appropriated fund, this bill would make an appropriation. Vote: majority. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 11011.29 is added to the   Government Code  , to read:   11011.29. Notwithstanding Section 11011.1 or any other law, the Director of General Services may transfer surplus state real property, or a portion of surplus state real property, to a local agency at a price that is less than fair market value, if the property to be transferred will be used solely for public school purposes.   SEC. 2.   Section 11011.30 is added to the   Government Code  , to read:   11011.30. The Director of General Services may enter into negotiations with the Santa Clara Unified School District, the City of San Jose, or both, to transfer title of all or a portion of the former Agnews Developmental Center to the district, the city, or both, for public school purposes, in accordance with Sections 11011.1 and 11011.29, and any other applicable provision of this article.   SECTION 1.   Section 11011.29 is added to the Government Code, to read: 11011.29. Notwithstanding Section 11011.1 or any other law, the Director of General Services may transfer title of the former Agnews Developmental Center to the Santa Clara Unified School District for educational purposes at fair market value. Fair market value shall be determined based upon a mutually acceptable value supported by an appraisal conducted by the department and an appraisal conducted by the Santa Clara Unified School District.