California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB514 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/26/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 514AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bonta FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act to amend Section 234.5 of the Education Code, relating to school safety. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 514, as amended, Bonta. The Safe Schools for Safe Learning Act of 2013. Existing law establishes the Safe Place to Learn Act and, among other things, requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to post on his or her Internet Web site a list of statewide resources that provide support to youth who have been subjected to school-based discrimination, harassment, or bullying, and their families. This bill, the Safe Schools for Safe Learning Act of 2013, would  instead  require the Superintendent to post  that information  on the  Superintendent's   State Department of Education's  Internet Web site  , and would also require the department's Internet Web site to include  a list of statewide resources for youth who have been affected by gangs, gun violence, and psychological trauma caused by violence at home  and at school   , at school, and in the community  . The bill would express various findings and declarations of the Legislature relating to school safety. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. This act shall be known as the Safe Schools for Safe Learning Act of 2013. SEC. 2.  (a)    The Legislature finds and declares all of the following:  (a) Child safety should be a priority in our state, and we, as the state Legislature, should ensure that our children are kept safe from any form of violence, especially while children are in school.   (b) Our children have the talent and capacity for greatness, if given the opportunity to thrive and grow in a healthy environment.   (c) Unfortunately, violence has become a fact of life for many pupils in the 18th Assembly District and throughout the state. For example, Oakland suffered from 131 homicides in 2012. Many children suffer complications from growing up in a violent environment, including depression and post-traumatic stress disorder, which makes it more difficult to become an engaged and productive pupil at school.   (d) Assembly Member Bonta has asked pupils to submit their responses to the question, "What would make you feel safer at school?" The Safe Schools for Safe Learning Act of 2013 will be based on the winning response to that question.   (e) We need to create safe and supportive school environments where each child is able to thrive. A school is not just a place for perfunctory instruction. It is also the place where a child learns about humanity, family, and community, free from violence and fear.   (1) Our children have the talent and capacity for greatness, if given the opportunity to thrive and grow in a healthy environment.   (2) Violence has become a fact of life for many children throughout the state, including living in communities with high rates of homicide.   (3) Many children suffer complications from growing up in a violent environment, including depression and post-traumatic stress disorder, which make it more difficult to become engaged and productive pupils at school.   (4) A school is a place not only for perfunctory instruction but also a place where children learn about humanity, family, and community, free from violence and fear.   (b) It is the intent of the Legislature to make safety a priority and ensure that our children are kept safe from all forms of violence, especially while children are in school. It is further the intent of the Legislature to create safe and supportive school environments where each child is able to thrive.  SEC. 3. Section 234.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 234.5. The Superintendent shall post, and annually update, on  his or her   the department's  Internet Web site and provide to each school district a list of statewide resources, including community-based organizations, that provide support to youth who have been subjected to school-based discrimination, harassment, intimidation, or bullying, and their families. The  Superintendent's   department's  Internet Web site shall also include a list of statewide resources for youth who have been affected by gangs, gun violence, and psychological trauma caused by violence at home  and at school   , at school, and in the community  .