California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB61 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/10/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 61ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 3, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 16, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gatto JANUARY 7, 2013 An act to amend, add, and repeal Section 22508.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to parking meters. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 61, Gatto. Parking: parking meters. Existing law authorizes a local authority to adopt an ordinance or resolution prohibiting or restricting the parking of a vehicle at an inoperable parking meter or inoperable parking payment center, as defined. Existing law authorizes parking at an inoperable parking meter for up to the posted time limit if no ordinance or resolution has been adopted to prohibit it. This bill would prohibit a local authority from enacting an ordinance or resolution prohibiting or restricting the parking of a vehicle in a parking space that is regulated by an inoperable parking meter or inoperable parking payment center, as defined, until January 1, 2017. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 22508.5 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 22508.5. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), a vehicle may park, for up to the posted time limit, in any parking space that is regulated by an inoperable parking meter or an inoperable parking payment center. (b) A local authority may, by ordinance or resolution, prohibit or restrict the parking of vehicles in a parking space regulated by an inoperable parking meter or inoperable parking payment center. An ordinance or resolution adopted by a local authority pursuant to this section shall not become effective until signs or markings giving adequate notice of the restriction or prohibition on parking have been placed at parking locations, parking meters, or parking payment centers. (c) For purposes of this section: (1) "Inoperable parking meter" means a meter located next to and designated for an individual parking space, which has become inoperable and cannot accept payment in any form or cannot register that a payment in any form has been made. (2) "Inoperable parking payment center" means an electronic parking meter or pay station serving one or more parking spaces that is closest to the space where a person has parked and that cannot accept payment in any form, cannot register that a payment in any form has been made, or cannot issue a receipt that is required to be displayed in a conspicuous location on or in the vehicle. (d) This section shall become inoperative on January 1, 2014, and shall remain inoperative until January 1, 2017. SEC. 2. Section 22508.5 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 22508.5. (a) A vehicle may park, for up to the posted time limit, in any parking space that is regulated by an inoperable parking meter or an inoperable parking payment center. (b) A local authority shall not, by ordinance or resolution, prohibit or restrict the parking of vehicles in a space that is regulated by an inoperable parking meter or inoperable parking payment center. (c) For purposes of this section: (1) "Inoperable parking meter" means a meter located next to and designated for an individual parking space, which has become inoperable and cannot accept payment in any form or cannot register that a payment in any form has been made. (2) "Inoperable parking payment center" means an electronic parking meter or pay station serving one or more parking spaces that is closest to the space where a person has parked and that cannot accept payment in any form, cannot register that a payment in any form has been made, or cannot issue a receipt that is required to be displayed in a conspicuous location on or in the vehicle. (d)This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2017, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date.