California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB692 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/03/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 692AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 3, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 11, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 2, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members  Torres   Gonzalez  and V. Manuel Prez  (   Principal coauthor:   Senator   De Len   )  FEBRUARY 21, 2013  An act to amend Sections 50781, 50782, and 50786 of, and to add Section 50784.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to mobilehomes, and making an appropriation therefor.   An act to submit an advisory question to the voters relating to immigration reform, calling an election, to take effect immediately.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 692, as amended,  Torres   Gonzalez  .  Mobilehomes: loans.   Immigration reform: advisory election.   This bill would call a special election to be consolidated with the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. The bill would require the Secretary of State to submit to the voters at the November 4, 2014, consolidated election an advisory question asking whether the Congress of the United States should immediately reform our immigration laws and pass comprehensive immigration reform that includes a path to citizenship for immigrants meeting certain requirements, as specified, and whether the President of the United States should halt deportations of parents whose children were born in the United States until that new immigration law is passed. The bill would require the Secretary of State to communicate the results of this election to the Congress of the United States.   This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an act calling an election.   Existing law authorizes the Department of Housing and Community Development to make loans from the Mobilehome Park Purchase Fund, a continuously appropriated fund, to qualified mobilehome park residents, resident organizations, and nonprofit housing sponsors or local public entities to finance conversion of the parks to resident ownership and to make monthly housing costs affordable. Existing law requires a specified regulatory agreement to be recorded against the mobilehome park if a loan is made to a qualifying nonprofit housing sponsor or local public entity pursuant to these provisions. Existing law also requires the provision of specified information to the department before making loans for mobilehome park conversions.   This bill would change the name of the fund to the Mobilehome Park Rehabilitation and Park Purchase Fund and authorize the department to provide loans from the fund to the owner of a mobilehome park for the purpose of rehabilitating park infrastructure, including water, sewage, and electrical systems. The bill would specify that the purpose of these loans would also be to bring mobilehome parks into compliance with applicable health and safety standards. The bill would require the department to consider specified criteria in determining eligibility for, and the amount of, loans made from the fund. The bill would require a regulatory agreement to be recorded against the mobilehome park if a loan is made to the owner of a mobilehome park and would require the agreement to contain provisions to prevent displacement of park residents. The bill would also require the provision of specified information to the department before making these loans.   By authorizing a new purpose for the use of continuously appropriated funds, this bill would make an appropriation.  Vote:  2/3   majority  . Appropriation:  yes   no  . Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   The Legislature finds and declares all of the following:   (a) The United States of America was founded on principles of freedom and opportunity, and on the tenet that all men and women are created equal.   (b) The nation's history has been indelibly shaped by waves of immigration.   (c) The current immigration system in the United States is antiquated, riddled with inefficiencies, and incapable of meeting the challenges of the 21st century and our changing economy.   (d) Immigrants are a major engine for the state's economic growth. Approximately 1 in 10 workers in California is an undocumented immigrant, totaling 1.85 million workers. Immigrants are vital for California's industries, including technology, agriculture, hospitality, and services.   (e) The undocumented immigrant population in the United States is currently 11.7 million and is expected to continue growing in the absence of immigration and regulatory reform.   (f) Almost one-quarter (23 percent) of the nation's undocumented immigrants reside in California.   (g) Thousands of families have been separated because of the enforcement of immigration laws that do not recognize the complexities of mixed-status families. Each year, more than 350,000 immigrants face deportation proceedings.   (h) Nearly one-half of undocumented immigrants in the United States are parents of minor children, and 77 percent of these children are United States citizens.   (i) Since 1998, about 600,000 children who are United States citizens have had a parent detained or deported. Currently, there are at least 5,100 children in the child welfare system because their parents are under immigration custody or have been deported. This number is expected to rise to 15,000 in the next five years.   SEC. 2.   A special election is hereby called to be held throughout the state on November 4, 2014. The special election shall be consolidated with the statewide general election to be held on that date. The consolidated election shall be held and conducted in all respects as if there were only one election and only one form of ballot shall be used.   SEC. 3.   (a) Notwithstanding Section 9040 of the Elections Code, the Secretary of State shall submit the following advisory question to the voters at the November 4, 2014, consolidated election:   "Shall the Congress of the United States reform our immigration laws and immediately pass comprehensive immigration reform that includes a path to citizenship to those immigrants who learn English, pass a background check, and pay back taxes, and shall the President of the United States halt the deportations of noncriminal mothers and fathers whose children were born in the United States, which separate families, until that new immigration law is passed?"   (b) Upon certification of the election, the Secretary of State shall communicate to the Congress of the United States the results of the election asking the question set forth in subdivision (a).   (c) The provisions of the Elections Code that apply to the preparation of ballot measures and ballot materials at a statewide election apply to the measure submitted pursuant to this section.   SEC. 4.   This act calls an election within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect.  All matter omitted in this version of the bill appears in the bill as amended in the Senate, July 11, 2013. (JR11)