California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB714 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/24/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 714AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wieckowski  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Harkey   )  FEBRUARY 21, 2013 An act relating to the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 714, as amended, Wieckowski. Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund. Existing law, the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Act of 1999, authorizes the University of California to establish a spinal cord injury research fund, independent of the State Treasury, to accept public and private funds for purposes of spinal cord injury research, as specified. This bill would appropriate $1,000,000 from the General Fund to the spinal cord injury research fund authorized by the act. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. There is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the spinal cord injury research fund authorized  by   pursuant to  the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Act of 1999 the amount of one million dollars ($1,000,000).