BILL NUMBER: AB 852AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 5, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 9, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 12, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 10, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dickinson Members Dickinson and Alejo ( Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Alejo ) ( Coauthor: Senator De Len ) FEBRUARY 21, 2013 An act to add Section 12801.2 to the Vehicle Code, relating to driver's licenses. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 852, as amended, Dickinson. Driver's licenses: applications. Existing law authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue original driver's licenses to qualified persons. Existing law requires every application for an original or a renewal of a driver's license to contain specified information about the applicant. This bill would prohibit a person from receiving financial compensation for the sole purpose of assisting an individual with a driver's license application. filling out an original driver's license application for another person. The bill would impose a $2,500 civil penalty for a violation of this provision and would authorize the enforcement of this provision by the Attorney General or by the district attorney, county counsel, or city attorney of the location in which the violation occurred, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12801.2 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 12801.2. (a) A person shall not receive financial compensation for the sole purpose of filling out an original driver's license application for an individual. another person. (b) A person in violation of this section is subject to a civil penalty of not more than two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500) for each offense. Actions for relief pursuant to this section may be commenced in a court of competent jurisdiction by the Attorney General, or by the district attorney, county counsel, or city attorney of the location in which the violation occurred. (c) Section 40000.1 does not apply to a violation of this section.